This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 16:27:53 (UTC).

Tanana Chiefs Conference et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2018 Tanana Chiefs Conference filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sharon L. Gleason and John W. Sedwick. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00260

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sharon L. Gleason

John W. Sedwick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation

Southcentral Foundation

Chugachmiut, Inc.

Copper River Native Association

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Mallinckrodt, LLC

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Albertsons Companies Llc

Mallinckrodt Plc

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Allergan Plc

Health Mart Systems, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Allergan Finance LLC

The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Walgreen Co.

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lloyd B. Miller

Attorney at Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Miller & Munson, LLP (Anch)

900 West 5Th Avenue, Suite 700

Anchorage, AK 99501

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketCase transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-67) - 14 action(s) re: pldg. (2 in AK/3:18-cv-00260, 1 in GAN/3:18-cv-00131, 2 in ID/1:18-cv-00479, 1 in KYW/1:18-cv-00158, 1 in KYW/3:18-cv-00714, 1 in KYW/3:18-cv-00715, 1 in KYW/3:18-cv-00716, 1 in KYW/4:18-cv-00169, 3024 in MDL No. 2804, 2 in MOE/4:18-cv-01882, 1 in MSN/4:18-cv-00212, 2 in NCE/5:18-cv-00517, 2 in OR/3:18-cv-01911, 1 in UT/2:18-cv-00863, 1 in WVS/2:18-cv-01392) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. This case transfer to the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against All Defendants, filed by Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation, Tanana Chiefs Conference, Chugachmiut, Inc., Southcentral Foundation, Copper River Native Association, Arctic Slope Native Association.(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Docket(#5) JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the Judges, this case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable John W. Sedwick for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:18-cv-00260-JWS. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE: This case is related to case number 3:18-cv-00243-JWS and 3:18-cv-00247-JWS, which are assigned to the Honorable Judge John W. Sedwick. (CME, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Cases by Chugachmiut, Inc., Copper River Native Association, Southcentral Foundation, Tanana Chiefs Conference, Yukon-Kuskokwim Health Corporation (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2602670.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Miller, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chugachmiut is a litigant

Latest cases where Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Southcentral Foundation is a litigant

Latest cases where Albertsons Companies, Inc. is a litigant