This case was last updated from PACER on 10/28/2018 at 08:00:16 (UTC).

Tabor v. Entzel

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 Tabor filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Entzel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John Preston Bailey, James E. Seibert and James P. Mazzone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00086

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Preston Bailey

Referral Judges

James E. Seibert

James P. Mazzone

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jameel Tabor

Bruceton Mills, WV 26525

Respondent

Frederick Entzel

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice, #3 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/21/18. (njz) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#9

(#9) Mail sent to Jameel Tabor 5 Case Reassigned Returned as Undeliverable: Return to Sender; Not Deliverable as Addressed; Unable to Forward. (nmm) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/20/2018) (nmm). (Entered: 09/20/2018)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) LETTER from Jameel Tabor to Clerk requesting status of case. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(njz) copy of docket sheet mailed to pro se pet via regular mail (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#7

(#7) Mail sent to Jameel Tabor #2 Notice, #3 Notice Returned as Undeliverable. Petitioner had wrong inmate number on complaint. Inmate number corrected. Docs #2 and #3 re-mailed. (njz) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #2

Certified Mail Return Receipt

3 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#3

(#3) NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pet via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 08/29/2018)

2 #2

Attachment PTAR

2 #1

Attachment 1st page Motion for IFP

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pet via cert. return rec't mail with appropriate forms (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2018: #1 Attachment 1st page Motion for IFP, #2 Attachment PTAR) (njz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2018: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Attachment Memorandum in Support

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Frederick Entzel filed by Jameel Tabor. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Envelope)(njz) case assigned to Judge Bailey, MJ Seibert, and LC Blalock (Entered: 08/29/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice, #3 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/21/18. (njz) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Mail sent to Jameel Tabor 5 Case Reassigned Returned as Undeliverable: Return to Sender; Not Deliverable as Addressed; Unable to Forward. (nmm) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/20/2018) (nmm). (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LETTER from Jameel Tabor to Clerk requesting status of case. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(njz) copy of docket sheet mailed to pro se pet via regular mail (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail sent to Jameel Tabor #2 Notice, #3 Notice Returned as Undeliverable. Petitioner had wrong inmate number on complaint. Inmate number corrected. Docs #2 and #3 re-mailed. (njz) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/4/18. (njz) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • (#5) Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone, per Order entered 9/4/2018 in 3:18-mc-100. Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert no longer assigned to the case. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff w/MC Order via US Mail) (nmm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC002330 (njz) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pet via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pet via cert. return rec't mail with appropriate forms (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2018: #1 Attachment 1st page Motion for IFP, #2 Attachment PTAR) (njz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2018: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz). (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Frederick Entzel filed by Jameel Tabor. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Envelope)(njz) case assigned to Judge Bailey, MJ Seibert, and LC Blalock (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less