This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2019 at 07:57:12 (UTC).

SYNAN v. CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 SYNAN filed an Other lawsuit against CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David S. Cercone and Marilyn J. Horan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01519

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David S. Cercone

Marilyn J. Horan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFREY SYNAN

Defendants

UNITED TOWING SERVICE, LLC

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cary L. Flitter

Attorney at Flitter Milz, P.C.

450 N. Narberth Avenue, Suite 101

Narberth, PA 19072

Andrew M. Milz

Attorney at Flitter Milz, P.C.

450 N. Narberth Avenue, Suite 101

Narberth, PA 19072

Jody T. Lopez-Jacobs

Attorney at Flitter Milz, P.C.

450 Narberth Ave, Suite 101

Narberth, PA 19072

Defendant Attorneys

John E. Egers, Jr.

Attorney at Julian Law Firm

71 North Main Street

Washington, PA 15301

Brandon Gamble

30 Valley Stream Parkway

Malvern, PA 19355

Eric M. Hurwitz

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP

457 Haddonfield Road, Suite 100

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION granting Plaintiff's #14 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's #14 Order granting Defendants' motion to compel arbitration. Order #14 is AMENDED to strike last paragraph as indicated, and that Counts IV and V of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint are reinstated. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/26/18. (rtw) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#15

(#15) BRIEF in Support re #14 Motion for Reconsideration filed by JEFFREY SYNAN. (Lopez-Jacobs, Jody) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) MOTION for Reconsideration re #13 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, by JEFFREY SYNAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lopez-Jacobs, Jody) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motions to compel arbitration #3 #9 , and Plaintiff's response #12 finding that this matter should be stayed pending arbitration. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's Motions to compel #3 #9 are GRANTED, as more fully stated in the Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/18/2018. (jgb) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration , #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JEFFREY SYNAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lopez-Jacobs, Jody) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss #3 and #9 by 12/17/2018. Defendants may file a Reply brief, which must be filed by 12/31/2018 and should not exceed 10 pages. Sur-reply briefs are not to be filed without leave of Court, and should not exceed 5 pages, if leave is granted. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/28/2018. (jgb) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#10

(#10) BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion to Compel filed by CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION. (jd) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

9 #2

Proposed Order

9 #1

Exhibit

#9

(#9) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hurwitz, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2018: #2 Proposed Order) (jd) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk shall reassign this action to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 11/20/18. (njt) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Consent Filing to the Notice of Removal as to Credit Acceptance Corporation by CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION. (Hurwitz, Eric) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jody T. Lopez-Jacobs on behalf of JEFFREY SYNAN. (Lopez-Jacobs, Jody) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Milz on behalf of JEFFREY SYNAN. (Milz, Andrew) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) MOTION to Compel Arbitration , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by UNITED TOWING SERVICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Egers, John) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) TEXT ORDER that pursuant to #13 Order dated 12/18/2018 this case is STAYED pending further order of Court. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/8/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rtw) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION granting Plaintiff's #14 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's #14 Order granting Defendants' motion to compel arbitration. Order #14 is AMENDED to strike last paragraph as indicated, and that Counts IV and V of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint are reinstated. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/26/18. (rtw) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) BRIEF in Support re #14 Motion for Reconsideration filed by JEFFREY SYNAN. (Lopez-Jacobs, Jody) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Reconsideration re #13 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, by JEFFREY SYNAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lopez-Jacobs, Jody) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motions to compel arbitration #3 #9 , and Plaintiff's response #12 finding that this matter should be stayed pending arbitration. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's Motions to compel #3 #9 are GRANTED, as more fully stated in the Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/18/2018. (jgb) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration , #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JEFFREY SYNAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lopez-Jacobs, Jody) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss #3 and #9 by 12/17/2018. Defendants may file a Reply brief, which must be filed by 12/31/2018 and should not exceed 10 pages. Sur-reply briefs are not to be filed without leave of Court, and should not exceed 5 pages, if leave is granted. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/28/2018. (jgb) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #9 Motion to Compel. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only., CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Memorandum in Support of Motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion to Compel filed by CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION. (jd) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hurwitz, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2018: #2 Proposed Order) (jd) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Judge Marilyn J. Horan added. (mao) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk shall reassign this action to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 11/20/18. (njt) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Consent Filing to the Notice of Removal as to Credit Acceptance Corporation by CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION. (Hurwitz, Eric) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jody T. Lopez-Jacobs on behalf of JEFFREY SYNAN. (Lopez-Jacobs, Jody) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Milz on behalf of JEFFREY SYNAN. (Milz, Andrew) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion to Compel, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by UNITED TOWING SERVICE, LLC. (Egers, John) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Compel Arbitration , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by UNITED TOWING SERVICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Egers, John) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION Answer due from CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION on 11/26/2018. (Hurwitz, Eric) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny, case number GD-18-12956 with BOTH Copies attached: Lower Court Complaint, Amended Complaint, Exhibits, Affidavit of Service (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4930972), filed by UNITED TOWING SERVICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED TOWING SERVICE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Credit Acceptance Corporation is a litigant