This case was last updated from PACER on 12/13/2018 at 07:04:00 (UTC).

Switz v. Financial Recoveries Inc et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2018 Switz filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Financial Recoveries Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01623

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emily J Switz

Defendants

John Does

Financial Recoveries Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Francis R Greene

Attorney at Stern Thomasson LLP

150 Morris Ave - 2Nd Fl

Springfield, NJ 07081

Andrew T Thomasson

Attorney at Stern Thomasson LLP

150 Morris Ave - 2Nd Fl

Springfield, NJ 07081

Philip D Stern

Attorney at Stern Thomasson LLP

150 Morris Ave - 2Nd Fl

Springfield, NJ 07081

Defendant Attorney

David M McDorman

Attorney at McDorman Law Office

613 Williamson St

Madison, WI 53703

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/30/2018 in favor of Emily J Switz against Financial Recoveries Inc. (cc: all counsel)(mac)

#11

(#11) ORDER FOR JUDGMENT signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/30/2018. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

10 #1

Exhibit "A" Rule 68 Offer of Judgment

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Emily J Switz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Rule 68 Offer of Judgment)(Thomasson, Andrew)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2018 09:30 AM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(lh)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants.(McDorman, David)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (McDorman, David)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by David M McDorman on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: David McDorman (McDorman, David)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily J Switz. Financial Recoveries Inc served on 10/15/2018. (Thomasson, Andrew)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Francis R Greene on behalf of Emily J Switz. Attorney(s) appearing: Francis R. Greene (Greene, Francis)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip D Stern on behalf of Emily J Switz. Attorney(s) appearing: Philip D. Stern (Stern, Philip)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit "A" Letter to Switz

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Violations of the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Emily J Switz. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2943684) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Letter to Switz, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Thomasson, Andrew)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 09:30 AM is removed from the court's calendar. (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/30/2018 in favor of Emily J Switz against Financial Recoveries Inc. (cc: all counsel)(mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER FOR JUDGMENT signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 11/30/2018. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Emily J Switz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Rule 68 Offer of Judgment)(Thomasson, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel)Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2018 09:30 AM in By Telephone before Chief Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(lh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to Complaint ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants.(McDorman, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (McDorman, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (McDorman, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by David M McDorman on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: David McDorman (McDorman, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily J Switz. Financial Recoveries Inc served on 10/15/2018. (Thomasson, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Francis R Greene on behalf of Emily J Switz. Attorney(s) appearing: Francis R. Greene (Greene, Francis)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip D Stern on behalf of Emily J Switz. Attorney(s) appearing: Philip D. Stern (Stern, Philip)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Financial Recoveries Inc. (mac)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2018
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cms) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Violations of the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Emily J Switz. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2943684) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Letter to Switz, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Thomasson, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.