This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2018 at 07:31:21 (UTC).

Sweat v. Sanders et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 Sweat filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sanders. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert E. Wier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00557

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Wier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Sweat

Defendants

Richard W. Sanders

William Alexander Payne

John Does 1-5

Todd Kidd

Joshua Satterly

Donald McCormick

Eric Barnett

Ray Caudill

John Hawkins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan K. Kurtz

Attorney at Spencer Law Group

2224 Regency Road

Lexington, KY 40503

Gregory Allen Belzley

Attorney at Belzley Bathurst, Attorneys

P.O. Box 278

Prospect, KY 40059

Camille Bathurst

Attorney at Belzley Bathurst, Attorneys

P.O. Box 278

Prospect, KY 40059

Defendant Attorneys

Cody Weber

Attorney at Kentucky State Police Legal Office

919 Versailles Road, Room 300

Frankfort, KY 40601

Aaron Ann Rose Cole

Attorney at Kentucky State Police Legal Office

919 Versailles Road, Room 300

Frankfort, KY 40601

Shawna Virgin Kincer

Attorney at Kentucky State Police Legal Office

919 Versailles Road, Room 300

Frankfort, KY 40601

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Todd Kidd, William Alexander Payne, Richard W. Sanders filed by Howard Sweat. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Belzley, Gregory) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

17 #4

Summons Donald McCormick

17 #3

Summons Joshua Satterly

17 #2

Summons Ray Caudill

17 #1

Summons Eric Barnet

#17

(#17) Summons Issued as to Eric Barnett, Ray Caudill, John Hawkins, Donald McCormick, Joshua Satterly; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Eric Barnet, #2 Summons Ray Caudill, #3 Summons Joshua Satterly, #4 Summons Donald McCormick)(JJ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: re #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Todd Kidd, William Alexander Payne, Richard W. Sanders (JJ) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Exhibit Email exchange on identity of troopers

#5

(#5) ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Expedite, without prejudice to renewal upon an adequate basis for finding good cause. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 10/15/2018. (JJ)cc: COR (Entered: 10/15/2018)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#5) ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Expedite, without prejudice to renewal upon an adequate basis for finding good cause. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 10/15/2018. (JJ)cc: COR (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Todd Kidd, William Alexander Payne, Richard W. Sanders; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (JLM) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4182632), filed by Howard Sweat. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(JLM) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Todd Kidd, William Alexander Payne, Richard W. Sanders filed by Howard Sweat. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Belzley, Gregory) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Summons Issued as to Eric Barnett, Ray Caudill, John Hawkins, Donald McCormick, Joshua Satterly; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Eric Barnet, #2 Summons Ray Caudill, #3 Summons Joshua Satterly, #4 Summons Donald McCormick)(JJ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Todd Kidd, William Alexander Payne, Richard W. Sanders, John Hawkins, Eric Barnett, Ray Caudill, Joshua Satterly, Donald McCormick, filed by Howard Sweat.(JJ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER: The Court GRANTS #14 Motion for Leave. The First Amended Complaint is FILED, and the Clerk shall issue summonses per the request and direction of counsel. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/13/2018. (JJ)cc: COR (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Leave by Howard Sweat (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Letter identifying KSP Troopers, #3 Summons, #4 Proposed Order)(Belzley, Gregory) Modified text on 11/8/2018 (JJ). (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE by Todd Kidd, William Alexander Payne, Richard W. Sanders of Producing Identity of Troopers (Kincer, Shawna) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 11/1/2018. before Judge Robert E. Wier: This matter was called to expedite consideration of the pending motion, and to allow defense input, with counsel participating as noted. The Court finds good cause for limited expedited discovery as to the identities of the unidentified Defendants in the Complaint. The Court GRANTS #6 Motion to Expedite on the terms outlined below: 1) NLT 11/8/18. Defendants shall identify in writing to Plaintiff each KSP Trooper that had a direct physical role in the chase at issue from the very start until the pursuit had ended. 2) By that same date, Defendants shall provide to Plaintiff addresses for service of process as to each person identified in Complaint. Due to the timing exigencies, the Court will not extend the deadlines. Each lawyer affected viewed the stated schedule as practicable. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (Tape #KYED-LON_5-18-CV-557-REW_20181101_160035 & KYED-LON_5-18-CV-557-REW_20181101_155924.) (JJ)cc: COR (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: re #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Todd Kidd, William Alexander Payne, Richard W. Sanders (JJ) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Kidd, William Alexander Payne, Richard W. Sanders. (Weber, Cody) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Kidd, William Alexander Payne, Richard W. Sanders. (Cole, Aaron Ann) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Kidd, William Alexander Payne, Richard W. Sanders. (Kincer, Shawna) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: The Court SCHEDULES a brief TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE, for counsel only, for 11/1/2018 at 04:00 PM in LONDON before Judge Robert E. Wier, sitting in London. Counsel for Plaintiff shall appear, and the Court will serve notice to the defense lawyers by e-mail at addresses in #6 ; those lawyers may participate if they choose. See order for call information. Court will utilize electronic digital audio recording system. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 10/31/2018.(GLD)cc: COR,London diary, Hon. Shawna V. Kincer via e-mail, Hon. James G. Womack via e-mail (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: re #6 MOTION to Expedite by Howard Sweat DISCOVERY OF TROOPER IDENTITIES (RENEWED) (JJ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Expedite by Howard Sweat DISCOVERY OF TROOPER IDENTITIES (RENEWED) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email exchange on identity of troopers, #2 Proposed Order)(Belzley, Gregory) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Expedite, without prejudice to renewal upon an adequate basis for finding good cause. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 10/15/2018. (JJ)cc: COR (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review: re #4 MOTION to Expedite by Howard Sweat (Discovery of John Does -- SOL Approaching (JJ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Expedite by Howard Sweat (Discovery of John Does -- SOL Approaching (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Belzley, Gregory) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Todd Kidd, William Alexander Payne, Richard W. Sanders; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (JLM) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (JLM) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4182632), filed by Howard Sweat. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(JLM) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.