This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2019 at 07:53:28 (UTC).

Swartz v. Aramark Services, Inc. Alias

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 Swartz filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Aramark Services, Inc Alias. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00654

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Serena Swartz

Defendants

Aramark Services, Inc. Alias

Aramark Management Services Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christine A. Monahan

128 Dorrance Street, Suite 530

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant Attorneys

Casey J. Lee

Attorney at Behman Hambelton, LLP

600 West Cummings Park, Suite 6650

Woburn, MA 01801

Sharmili P. Das

Attorney at Behman Hambelton LLP

800 West Cummings Park, Suite 6650

Woburn, MA 01801

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 9/13/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 10/30/2019; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 11/29/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 1/17/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 2/21/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/16/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#9

(#9) RULE 16 STATEMENT by Aramark Management Services Limited Partnership. (Lee, Casey) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Aramark Management Services Limited Partnership Joint Proposed Scheduling Order (Lee, Casey) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Sharmili P. Das to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1309104 ) filed by Aramark Management Services Limited Partnership. (Lee, Casey) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, 1/17/2019 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Aramark Management Services Limited Partnership.(Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTIES filed by Aramark Services, Inc. Alias. (Lee, Casey) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#3

(#3) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#2

(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit Entry of Appearance

1 #4

Exhibit Deft's Ans. to Pltf's Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit Summons

1 #2

Exhibit Removal from Superior Court

1 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC 2018-7672. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1294913, filed by Aramark Services, Inc. Alias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Removal from Superior Court, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Deft's Ans. to Pltf's Complaint, #5 Exhibit Entry of Appearance, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Casey) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 9/13/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 10/30/2019; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 11/29/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 1/17/2020 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 2/21/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/16/2019. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • HEARING CANCELLED: The telephonic rule 16 conference scheduled for Thursday, 1/17/19 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. is cancelled (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RULE 16 STATEMENT by Aramark Management Services Limited Partnership. (Lee, Casey) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Aramark Management Services Limited Partnership Joint Proposed Scheduling Order (Lee, Casey) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sharmili P. Das. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/9/2019. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Sharmili P. Das to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1309104 ) filed by Aramark Management Services Limited Partnership. (Lee, Casey) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, 1/17/2019 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Aramark Management Services Limited Partnership.(Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entering #4 Stipulation to substitute Aramark Management Services Limited Partnership for Aramark Services, Inc.- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/7/2018. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTIES filed by Aramark Services, Inc. Alias. (Lee, Casey) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC 2018-7672. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1294913, filed by Aramark Services, Inc. Alias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Removal from Superior Court, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Deft's Ans. to Pltf's Complaint, #5 Exhibit Entry of Appearance, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Casey) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC 2018-7672. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1294913, filed by Aramark Services, Inc. Alias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Removal from Superior Court, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Deft's Ans. to Pltf's Complaint, #5 Exhibit Entry of Appearance, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Casey) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less