This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2019 at 07:37:46 (UTC).

Sustaita v. Gutierrez et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 Sustaita filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Gutierrez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Darrow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04214

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Darrow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Sustaita

Galesburg, IL 61401

Defendants

Correctional Officer Gutierrez

Lieutenant Martinez

Warden Stepanie Dorethy

Correctional Officer King

Director John Baldwin

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Defendant Gutierrez on 1/7/2019. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#9

(#9) HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 1/7/2019. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#8

(#8) MERIT REVIEW OPINION - Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 1/7/2019. See written Order. This case is now in the process of service. The clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The clerk is directed to terminate Lieutenant Martinez, Correctional Officer King, Warden Stephanie Dorethy and Director John Baldwin as defendants. The clerk is directed to attempt service on the remaining defendant pursuant to the standard procedures. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#7

(#7) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/14/2018 10:39:20 AM ]. File Size [ 3784 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:53 ]. (admin). (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#6

(#6) Telephone WRIT issued for the 12/14/2018 Merit Review Hearing. (Writ faxed and sent via conventional mail to Hill C.C.) (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Letter from Clerk of Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Antonio Sustaita.(LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801.Merit Review Deadline set for 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Antonio Sustaita. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Defendant Gutierrez on 1/7/2019. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 1/7/2019. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MERIT REVIEW OPINION - Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 1/7/2019. See written Order. This case is now in the process of service. The clerk is directed to enter the standard qualified protective order pursuant to the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. The clerk is directed to terminate Lieutenant Martinez, Correctional Officer King, Warden Stephanie Dorethy and Director John Baldwin as defendants. The clerk is directed to attempt service on the remaining defendant pursuant to the standard procedures. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held 12/14/18 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance by Plaintiff Antonio Sustaita. Merit review hearing held by telephone. Allegations of the complaint discussed. Written order to be entered. (Tape #UR-C 10:39 AM.) (TC, ilcd) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/14/2018 10:39:20 AM ]. File Size [ 3784 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:53 ]. (admin). (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Telephone WRIT issued for the 12/14/2018 Merit Review Hearing. (Writ faxed and sent via conventional mail to Hill C.C.) (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 11/30/18. A merit review hearing is set for December 14, 2018, at 10:45 a.m., by telephone conference call from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue a writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this merit review hearing. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER - Entered by Judge Sara Darrow on 11/16/2018 granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $1.77. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Clerk of Court requesting Trust Fund Ledgers. (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Antonio Sustaita.(LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801.Merit Review Deadline set for 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Antonio Sustaita. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LN, ilcd) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less