This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2020 at 09:13:20 (UTC).

Susan McKnight, Inc. v. United Industries Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/30/2016 Susan McKnight, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against United Industries Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-02534

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan McKnight, Inc.

Defendant

United Industries Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Charles Linderman

Attorney at MCCORMICK PAULDING & HUBER LLP

185 Asylum Street, City Place Ii, 18Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

Adam S. Baldridge

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ-Memphis

165 Madison Ave, Ste 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Pepke

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

6075 Poplar Ave, 5Th Floor

Memphis, TN 38119

Clifford Ragsdale Lamar, II

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

6075 Poplar Avenue, 5Th Floor

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

#62

61 #3

Exhibit B '511 Patent IPR

61 #2

Exhibit A '973 Patent IPR

61 #1

Memorandum in support of Motion

#61

60 #2

Exhibit B Decision of Institution of IPR '511

60 #1

Exhibit A Decision of Institution of IPR '973

#60

#40

#9

#8

#7

#6

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 9,253,973

#1

104 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) ORDER denying #40 Motion to Dismiss; granting #40 Alternative Motion to Transfer; denying #61 Motion to Stay; and Transferring Case. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 02/27/2018. (McCalla, Jon) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Consent MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review, proposed order submitted by United Industries Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A '973 Patent IPR, #3 Exhibit B '511 Patent IPR)(Pepke, Amy) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE by United Industries Corporation of Institution of Inter Partes Review of '973 and '511 Patents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Decision of Institution of IPR '973, #2 Exhibit B Decision of Institution of IPR '511)(Pepke, Amy) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION for Reconsideration re #35 MOTION for Reconsideration re #32 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Stay /Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Reconsider Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for filed by Susan McKnight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Linderman, John) (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #38 MOTION for Reconsideration re #35 MOTION for Reconsideration re #32 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Stay /Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Reconsider Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for filed by Susan McKnight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Linderman, John) (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) MEMORANDUM in Support re #35 MOTION for Reconsideration re #32 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Stay filed by United Industries Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Trogdon Declaration)(Pepke, Amy) (Entered: 11/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #43 defendant's Motion for Order of Protection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 11/9/2017. (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 11/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION for Protective Order Related To Discovery and Supplemental Briefing Deadline of Friday, July 27, 2017 filed by Susan McKnight, Inc.. (Linderman, John) (Entered: 09/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Text ORDER permitting Plaintiff to file a supplemental response. On Sept. 21 2017, Defendant filed a Notice of Supplemental Authority #53 notifying the court of the Federal Circuit's decision in In re: Cray, Inc., 2017-129 (Fed. Cir. Sept. 21, 2017). Because this decision directly impacts the pending Motion for Order of Protection #43 , the court will permit plaintiff to file a supplemental response by no later than September 29, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 9/22/2017. (TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY) (Pham, Tu) (Entered: 09/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE by United Industries Corporation re #43 MOTION for Protective Order Related To Discovery and Supplemental Briefing Deadline of Friday, July 27, 2017 Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A In Re: Cray, Inc.)(Pepke, Amy) (Entered: 09/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/18/2016. (McCalla, Jon) (Entered: 10/18/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, proposed order submitted by United Industries Corporation. (Lamar, Clifford) (Entered: 10/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford Ragsdale Lamar, II on behalf of United Industries Corporation (Lamar, Clifford) (Entered: 10/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Pepke on behalf of United Industries Corporation (Pepke, Amy) (Entered: 10/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Susan McKnight, Inc.. (Baldridge, Adam) (Entered: 07/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 06/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Complex track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 06/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld) (Entered: 06/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,253,973; . (Baldridge, Adam) (Entered: 06/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against United Industries Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0651-2354863), filed by Susan McKnight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 9,253,973, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baldridge, Adam) (Entered: 06/30/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Industries Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy Pepke