This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2019 at 08:00:43 (UTC).

Super Interconnect Technologies LLC v. Sony Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 Super Interconnect Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sony Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01731

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Super Interconnect Technologies LLC

Defendants

Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.

Sony Mobile Communications AB

Sony Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Farnan

Brian E. Farnan

T. William Kennedy, Jr.

Jeffrey R. Bragalone

Brian P. Herrmann

Defendant Attorneys

Lewis V. Popovski

Rodger Dallery Smith, II

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

12/10/2018

DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Lewis V. Popovski for Sony Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., and Sony Mobile Communications AB added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2018
View Court Documents

DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lewis V. Popovski filed by Sony Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/6/2018. (fms) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sony Mobile Communications Inc. for Sony Mobile Communications AB; Corporate Parent Sony Mobile Communications AB for Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc.; Other Affiliate Sony Mobile Communications Inc. for Sony Corporation filed by Sony Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Lewis V. Popovski - filed by Sony Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB. (Smith, Rodger) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2018

DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney T. William Kennedy, Jr,Jeffrey R. Bragalone,Brian P. Herrmann for Super Interconnect Technologies LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01731-CFC, 1:18-cv-01730-CFC(crb) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2018

DocketSO ORDERED, re (4 in 1:18-cv-01731-CFC, 4 in 1:18-cv-01729-CFC, 4 in 1:18-cv-01730-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey R. Bragalone, T. William Kennedy, Jr., and Brian P. Herrmann filed by Super Interconnect Technologies LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/8/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01729-CFC, 1:18-cv-01730-CFC, 1:18-cv-01731-CFC(fms) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeffrey R. Bragalone, T. William Kennedy, Jr., and Brian P. Herrmann - filed by Super Interconnect Technologies LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2018

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01728-CFC, 1:18-cv-01729-CFC, 1:18-cv-01730-CFC, 1:18-cv-01731-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2018

DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc. on 11/2/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,627,044 B2 ;US 6,463,092 B1 ;US 7,158,593 B2. (nmg) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Sony Corporation, Sony Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., Sony Mobile Communications AB - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2495699.) - filed by Super Interconnect Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less