This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2019 at 07:49:48 (UTC).

Summit Properties Partnership v. Advance Stores Company, Incorporated (TV3)

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 Summit Properties Partnership filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Advance Stores Company, Incorporated TV3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas A Varlan and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00497

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Summit Properties Partnership

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Advance Stores Company, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Dean Thomas Howell

Attorney at Woolf, McClane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC

P O Box 900, 900 S. Gay Street

Knoxville, TN 37901

Charles Gavin Shepherd

Attorney at Woolf, McClane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC

P O Box 900, 900 S. Gay Street

Knoxville, TN 37901

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David A Draper

Attorney at Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Knox)

One Centre Square, 620 Market Street, 5Th Floor

Knoxville, TN 37901

Brady C Cody

Attorney at Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Knox)

One Centre Square, 620 Market Street, 5Th Floor

Knoxville, TN 37901

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Summit Properties Partnership (Howell, Dean) (Main Document 23 replaced on 1/22/2019 with flattened .pdf) (AYB). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#22

(#22) REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#21

(#21) RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Draper, David) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#20

(#20) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#19

(#19) MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#18

(#18) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand (Reply Memorandum) filed by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

10 #3

Exhibit 3- November 26, 2018 email from Advance Stores' counsel with attach

10 #2

Exhibit 2- November 20, 2018 email from Advance Stores' counsel

10 #1

Exhibit 1- November 19, 2018 email from Advance Stores' counsel with attach

#8

(#8) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/27/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#7

(#7) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/27/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#6

(#6) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/27/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#5

(#5) Administrative Notice to Counsel #3 Notice (Other) : Wrong event used. Please file using the event Certificate of Corporate Interest under Other Documents. Requirements due by 12/3/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated of Filing of Removal to Plaintiff's Attorney (Draper, David) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#3

(#5) Administrative Notice to Counsel #3 Notice (Other) : Wrong event used. Please file using the event Certificate of Corporate Interest under Other Documents. Requirements due by 12/3/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Draper, David) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit state pleadings

#1

(#3) NOTICE by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal, Disclosure Statement (Draper, David) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Summit Properties Partnership (Howell, Dean) (Main Document 23 replaced on 1/22/2019 with flattened .pdf) (AYB). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Draper, David) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand (Reply Memorandum) filed by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Remand to State Court (Renewed) by Summit Properties Partnership. (Howell, Dean) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Draper, David) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Amended ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief against Summit Properties Partnership by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Draper, David) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collective A amended notice of removal) (Cody, Brady) Modified text on 12/10/2018 (AYB). (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Advance Auto Parts, Inc for Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Draper, David) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/27/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/27/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/27/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Administrative Notice to Counsel #3 Notice (Other) : Wrong event used. Please file using the event Certificate of Corporate Interest under Other Documents. Requirements due by 12/3/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated of Filing of Removal to Plaintiff's Attorney (Draper, David) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal, Disclosure Statement (Draper, David) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Draper, David) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County General Sessions Court Div. II, case number 18CW0961. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3825976), filed by Advance Stores Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state pleadings)(Draper, David) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.