This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2017 at 02:19:59 (UTC).

Summers Manufacturing Company, Inc. v. Tri-County Ag, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2017 Summers Manufacturing Company, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Tri-County Ag, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:17-CV-00186

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Summers Manufacturing Company, Inc.

Defendants

Tri-County Ag, LLC

Tri County Iron, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chad E. Ziegler

Attorney at NEUSTEL LAW OFFICES, LTD

2534 S University Dr, Suite 4

Fargo, ND 58103

Michael S. Neustel

Attorney at NEUSTEL LAW OFFICES, LTD

2534 S University Dr, Suite 4

Fargo, ND 58103

Defendant Attorneys

W. Todd Haggart

Attorney at VOGEL LAW FIRM

218 Np Avenue, Po Box 1389

Fargo, ND 58107-1389

David T. Bower

Attorney at NYEMASTER GOODE PC

700 Walnut Street, Suite 1600

Des Moines, IA 50309-3899

Jeffrey D Harty

Attorney at NYEMASTER GOODE PC

700 Walnut Street, Suite 1600

Des Moines, IA 50309-3899

 

Court Documents

27 #1

*Restricted*

#27

(#27) Case transferred in from District of North Dakota; Case Number 3:16-cv-00417. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/25/2017)

#26

(#26) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #25 joint stipulation and request to transfer case to the UnitedStates District Court for the Southern District of Iowa, Central Division, and finding as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (AS) (Entered: 05/25/2017)

#25

(#25) STIPULATION by Tri County Iron, LLC, Tri-County Ag, LLC. (Haggart, W.) (Entered: 05/24/2017)

24 #1

Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Jeff Huitt

#24

(#24) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Tri County Iron, LLC, Tri-County Ag, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Jeff Huitt)(Haggart, W.) (Entered: 03/10/2017)

#23

(#23) STIPULATION re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Tri County Iron, LLC, Tri-County Ag, LLC. (Haggart, W.) (Entered: 03/01/2017)

22 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Chad E. Ziegler

#13

(#19) (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal re #18 Stipulation filed by Summers Manufacturing Company, Inc. The response to the #13 Motion to Dismiss is due by 2/17/2017, and the reply is due by 3/3/2017. (LS) (Entered: 02/10/2017)

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Tri County Iron, LLC, Tri-County Ag, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 12/12/2016)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E - Letter from Huitt to Neustel 11/11/16

1 #4

Exhibit D - Letter from Neustel to Huitt 11/7/16

1 #3

Exhibit C - Tri-County Facebook Page posts

1 #2

Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 9,462,737

1 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 9,326,439

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Tri County Iron, LLC, Tri-County Ag, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 317000112) filed by Summers Manufacturing Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 9,326,439, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 9,462,737, #3 Exhibit C - Tri-County Facebook Page posts, #4 Exhibit D - Letter from Neustel to Huitt 11/7/16, #5 Exhibit E - Letter from Huitt to Neustel 11/11/16, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh) (Entered: 12/12/2016)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Case transferred in from District of North Dakota; Case Number 3:16-cv-00417. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #25 joint stipulation and request to transfer case to the UnitedStates District Court for the Southern District of Iowa, Central Division, and finding as moot #13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (AS) (Entered: 05/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) STIPULATION by Tri County Iron, LLC, Tri-County Ag, LLC. (Haggart, W.) (Entered: 05/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Tri County Iron, LLC, Tri-County Ag, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Jeff Huitt)(Haggart, W.) (Entered: 03/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STIPULATION re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Tri County Iron, LLC, Tri-County Ag, LLC. (Haggart, W.) (Entered: 03/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Summers Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Bruce Johnson, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Chad E. Ziegler, #3 Exhibit to the Declaration of Chad E. Ziegler, #4 Exhibit to the Declaration of Chad E. Ziegler, #5 Exhibit to the Declaration of Chad E. Ziegler)(Neustel, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chad Ziegler. (LS) NEF Regenerated to PHV attorney Chad Ziegler. (as) (Entered: 02/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Responses due by 2/17/2017 Replies due by 3/3/2017. (rh) (Entered: 02/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Chad Ziegler (Filing fee $150, receipt number 317000217) by Summers Manufacturing Company, Inc. (as) (Entered: 02/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) (Text Only) ORDER Adopting Stipulation by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal re #18 Stipulation filed by Summers Manufacturing Company, Inc. The response to the #13 Motion to Dismiss is due by 2/17/2017, and the reply is due by 3/3/2017. (LS) (Entered: 02/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney David T. Bower (Filing fee $150, receipt number 317000174) by Tri County Iron, LLC, Tri-County Ag, LLC. (as) (Entered: 01/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey D. Harty (Filing fee $150, receipt number 317000174) by Tri County Iron, LLC, Tri-County Ag, LLC. (as) (Entered: 01/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) (Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal adopting the #8 Stipulation filed by Tri-County Ag, LLC, Tri County Iron, LLC. All Defendants answer due 1/20/2017. (AS) (Entered: 01/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION by Tri County Iron, LLC, Tri-County Ag, LLC. (Haggart, W.) (Entered: 01/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Todd Haggart on behalf of All Defendants (Haggart, W.) (Entered: 01/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Summers Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Neustel, Michael) (Entered: 12/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summers Manufacturing Company, Inc.. Tri County Iron, LLC served on 12/13/2016, answer due 1/3/2017 (jt) (Entered: 12/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) *RESTRICTED - WRONG EVENT* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Summers Manufacturing Company, Inc. (Neustel, Michael) Modified on 12/20/2016 to restrict access (jt). (Entered: 12/19/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Tri County Iron, LLC, Tri-County Ag, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 12/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Tri County Iron, LLC, Tri-County Ag, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 317000112) filed by Summers Manufacturing Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 9,326,439, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 9,462,737, #3 Exhibit C - Tri-County Facebook Page posts, #4 Exhibit D - Letter from Neustel to Huitt 11/7/16, #5 Exhibit E - Letter from Huitt to Neustel 11/11/16, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh) (Entered: 12/12/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Neustel