This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 15:55:48 (UTC).

Sullivan v. The Abbott Laboratories et al

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 Sullivan filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against The Abbott Laboratories. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas G. Garaufis and Robert M. Levy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05698

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G. Garaufis

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joyce Sullivan

Defendants

Kremers-Urban Co.

Lannett Co., Inc.

Mallinckrodt Inc.

McNeilab, Inc.

Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

The Abbott Laboratories

Rowell Laboratories, Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Carnrick Laboratories, Inc.

Burroughs-Wellcome & Co., Inc.

Dart Industries Inc.

The Upjohn Company

Merck & Co., Inc.

Eli Lilly and Company

E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc.

SmithKline Beecham Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A London

Attorney at Douglas & London, P.C.

59 Maiden Lane, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

Defendant Attorneys

Susan Charters

Attorney at McGivney & Kluger, PC

80 Broad Street, 23Rd Floor

New York, NY 10004

Daniel W. Whitney

Attorney at Whitney & Bogris, LLP

332 East 19Th Street, Suite 18

New York, NY 10003

Kevin Charles Tierney

Attorney at Tierney Law Office

100 South Broad Street, 1125 Land Title Building

Philadelphia, PA 19110

John C. Maloney

Attorney at Zuber Lawler & Del Duca LLP

420 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10170

Heidi Elizabeth Hilgendorff

Attorney at Drinker, Biddle & Reath

500 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Diane E. Lifton

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

One Battery Park Plaza

New York, NY 10004

Samuel J. Abate, Jr.

Attorney at Pepper Hamilton LLP

620 Eighth Avenue, 37Th Floor

New York, NY 10018-1405

Jessica Carol Wilson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#37

#36

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kremers-Urban Co. (Charters, Susan) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Kremers-Urban Co.. (Charters, Susan) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Letter MOTION to Reassign Case by Eli Lilly and Company. (Abate, Samuel) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Sullivan. Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/22/2018. (London, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Sullivan. Merck & Co., Inc. served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (London, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Sullivan. GlaxoSmithKline LLC served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (London, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Sullivan. McNeilab, Inc. served on 10/30/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (London, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Sullivan. Burroughs-Wellcome & Co., Inc. served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/22/2018. (London, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Sullivan. Rowell Laboratories, Inc. served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (London, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Sullivan. Eli Lilly and Company served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (London, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #(2) IC Questionnaire and #3 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine). Modified, deleted attachment #1 filed in error on 11/6/2018 (Marino, Janine). (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Tierney, Kevin) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Tierney, Kevin) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Whitney on behalf of Mallinckrodt Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Whitney, Daniel) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc.. (Wilson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Carol Wilson on behalf of E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Wilson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Burroughs-Wellcome & Co., Inc., Carnrick Laboratories, Inc., Dart Industries Inc., E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Kremers-Urban Co., Lannett Co., Inc., Mallinckrodt Inc., McNeilab, Inc., Merck & Co., Inc., Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rowell Laboratories, Inc., The Abbott Laboratories, The Upjohn Company. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 4653133242. (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Burroughs-Wellcome & Co., Inc., Carnrick Laboratories, Inc., Dart Industries Inc., E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Kremers-Urban Co., Lannett Co., Inc., Mallinckrodt Inc., McNeilab, Inc., Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rowell Laboratories, Inc., The Abbott Laboratories, The Upjohn Company Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Joyce Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Williams, Erica) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rowell Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Burroughs-Wellcome & Co., Inc. is a litigant