This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2018 at 07:58:40 (UTC).

Sullivan v. Burleson et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 Sullivan filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Burleson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00223

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Devon Sullivan

Defendants

Garrett Dunlap

Andy Simmons

AJ Solis, Jr.

Matthew Burleson

Danny Dupont

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrea L. Worden

Attorney at Worden Law Firm

109 E Tonhawa St, Ste 100

Norman, OK 73069

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Andy Simmons (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Danny Dupont (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Garrett Dunlap (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to AJ Solis, Jr (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Matthew Burleson (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

4 #1

Consent/Reassignment Form

#4

(#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 10/25/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/24/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Matthew Burleson, Garrett Dunlap, Danny Dupont, Andy Simmons, AJ Solis, Jr by Devon Sullivan (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Devon Sullivan (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Andy Simmons (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Danny Dupont (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Garrett Dunlap (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to AJ Solis, Jr (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Matthew Burleson (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 10/25/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/24/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1194088 (Re: #2 Complaint) by Devon Sullivan (sms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/24/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Matthew Burleson, Garrett Dunlap, Danny Dupont, Andy Simmons, AJ Solis, Jr by Devon Sullivan (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Devon Sullivan (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less