This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:45:24 (UTC).

Sullivan et al v. Harris et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Sullivan filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Harris. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott W Skavdahl and Kelly H Rankin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00140

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wyoming District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott W Skavdahl

Referral Judge

Kelly H Rankin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Marguerite Sullivan

Pike H Sullivan

Pike H Sullivan, III

Defendants

George R Harris

George R Harris Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rebecca A Lewis

Attorney at PENCE & MacMILLAN

501 Garfield Street, P O Box 1285

Laramie, WY 82073

Keith M Fleischman

Attorney at FLEISCHMAN LAW FIRM PLLC

1110 Maple Way, 2Nd Floor

Jackson, WY 83001

Defendant Attorneys

Scott P Klosterman

Attorney at WILLIAMS PORTER DAY & NEVILLE

159 North Wolcott, Suite 400, P O Box 10700

Casper, WY 82602

Scott E Ortiz

Attorney at WILLIAMS PORTER DAY & NEVILLE

159 North Wolcott, Suite 400, P O Box 10700

Casper, WY 82602

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rebecca A Lewis on behalf of Marguerite Sullivan, Pike H Sullivan (Court Staff, sal) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George R Harris, George R Harris(individually). George R Harris 8/28/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; George R Harris(individually) 8/28/2018, answer due 10/29/2018 (Court Staff, scat) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/29/2018) (Court Staff, scat). (Entered: 08/29/2018)

7 #1

Errata

#6

(#6) ERRATA re #3 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Defendants George R Harris, George R Harris Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Errata) (Ortiz, Scott) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott P Klosterman on behalf of George R Harris, George R Harris(individually) (Court Staff, scat) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott E Ortiz on behalf of George R Harris, George R Harris(individually) (Court Staff, scat) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#8

(#8) ERRATA re #5 Waiver of Service Executed, by Defendants George R Harris, George R Harris Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Errata) (Ortiz, Scott) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) ERRATA re #4 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Defendants George R Harris, George R Harris Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Errata) (Ortiz, Scott) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

6 #1

Errata

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith M Fleischman on behalf of Marguerite Sullivan, Pike H Sullivan, III (Fleischman, Keith) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (summonses issued) with Jury Demand (Filing fee ($400) - receipt #CHY029384) filed by Marguerite Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sal) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

8 #1

Errata

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith M Fleischman on behalf of Marguerite Sullivan, Pike H Sullivan, III (Fleischman, Keith) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ERRATA re #5 Waiver of Service Executed, by Defendants George R Harris, George R Harris Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Errata) (Ortiz, Scott) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ERRATA re #4 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Defendants George R Harris, George R Harris Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Errata) (Ortiz, Scott) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ERRATA re #3 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Defendants George R Harris, George R Harris Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Errata) (Ortiz, Scott) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by George R Harris, George R Harris(individually). George R Harris 8/28/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; George R Harris(individually) 8/28/2018, answer due 10/29/2018 (Court Staff, scat) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/29/2018) (Court Staff, scat). (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott E Ortiz on behalf of George R Harris, George R Harris(individually) (Court Staff, scat) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott P Klosterman on behalf of George R Harris, George R Harris(individually) (Court Staff, scat) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rebecca A Lewis on behalf of Marguerite Sullivan, Pike H Sullivan (Court Staff, sal) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (summonses issued) with Jury Demand (Filing fee ($400) - receipt #CHY029384) filed by Marguerite Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sal) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.