This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2018 at 16:08:32 (UTC).

Sulda v. www.shippingquest.com et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2017 Sulda filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against www shippingquest com. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joan B. Gottschall and Manish S. Shah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-02350

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joan B. Gottschall

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sulda

Wendy Lee Sulda

Defendants

www.shippingquest.com

Mitchell Rosenberg

Winston Dan Vogel

www.uboxweship.com

www.shippin-quest.com

PRICEBREAK SHIPPING, INC.

180 Grand Avenue, Suite 380

Oakland, CA 94612

Price Break Shipping USA, LLC

www.shippingquest.net

Richard Bells

Albert Abramov

www.pricebreakshipping.com

Shippingquest.com, LLC

Javier Sajnovsky

Registrant of www.wendysulda.com

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Edward McElvenny

Attorney at Law Offices of Charles E. McElvenny

20 N Clark St, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60602

Larry Ford Banister, II

Attorney at The Law Office of L. Ford Banister, II

Po Box 3514 Pmb 23332

New York, NY 10008

Defendant Attorneys

Steven Neal Fritzshall

Attorney at Fritzshall & Pawlowski

6584 North Northwest Highway

Chicago, IL 60631

Brad J. Pawlowski

Attorney at Fritzshall & Pawlowski

6584 North Northwest Highway, First Floor

Chicago, IL 60631

Sean Patrick Sullivan

Attorney at O'flaherty Law

5002 Main St Ste 201

Downers Grove, IL 60515

 

Court Documents

#194

(#194) ATTORNEY Appearance for Shipping Quest, LLC by Sean Sullivan. (Sullivan, Sean) (Docket Text Modified on 10/30/2018 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ). (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#193

(#193) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, attorneys Steven N. Fritzshall and Brad J. Pawloski's motion to withdraw as attorney for all defendants #188 is granted. Steven N. Fritzshall and Brad J. Pawloski are terminated as counsel of record for all defendants. For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff Wendy Lee Sulda's motions to seal document #181 , for preliminary injunction #171 , and to appoint receiver #170 are denied. The clerk is directed to remove the sealed filing #179 from the docket, and plaintiff shall file a public document with appropriate redactions. Plaintiff Sulda's motion for joinder #190 is taken under advisement. No appearance is necessary on the motion hearing set for 10/30/2018 at 9:45 a.m. Notices mailed. (jk, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#190

(#190) MOTION by Plaintiff Wendy Lee Sulda for joinder of Non-Parties Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(c) [Shimon Galapo, Stav Ben Haim, Diplomat Hallandale LLC and BH S Logistics LLC] (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

188 #1

Notification of Party Contact Information

#188

(#188) MOTION by Attorney Steven N. Fritzshall, Brad J. Pawlowski to withdraw as attorney for Albert Abramov, Price Break Shipping USA, LLC, Javier Sajnovsky, Shippingquest.com, LLC, Winston Dan Vogel. New address information: Winston Dan Vogel, info@shippingquest.com, oritgalapo@yahoo.com, winidan@hotmail.com, winstonvogel181@comcast.net, Javier Sajnovsky, info@shippingquest.com, chaim.sajnovsky@gmail.com, chaimsajnovsky@gmail.com, chaim@b7dev.com, Albert Abramov, info@shippingquest.com, shippingquest1@yahoo.com, info@pricebreakshipping.com, iaberto2005@yahoo.com, monicarod3333@yahoo.com, Shippingquest.com, LLC, info@shippingquest.com, oritgalapo@yahoo.com, winidan@hotmail.com, winstonvogel181@comcast.net, Price Break Shipping USA, LLC, info@shippingquest.com, oritgalapo@yahoo.com, winidan@hotmail.com, winstonvogel181@comcast.net (Attachments: #1 Notification of Party Contact Information)(Fritzshall, Steven) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#181

(#184) NOTICE of Motion by Larry Ford Banister, II for presentment of motion to appoint receiver #170 , motion to seal document #181 , motion for preliminary injunction #171 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/23/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 10/14/2018)

#171

(#184) NOTICE of Motion by Larry Ford Banister, II for presentment of motion to appoint receiver #170 , motion to seal document #181 , motion for preliminary injunction #171 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/23/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 10/14/2018)

#170

(#184) NOTICE of Motion by Larry Ford Banister, II for presentment of motion to appoint receiver #170 , motion to seal document #181 , motion for preliminary injunction #171 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/23/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 10/14/2018)

5 #6

*Restricted*

5 #2

Exhibit

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) DECLARATION of WENDY LEE SULDA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Banister, Larry) (Entered: 03/29/2017)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Wendy Lee Sulda to seal case (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 03/28/2017)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wendy Lee Sulda by Larry Ford Banister, II (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 03/28/2017)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 03/28/2017)

1 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wendy Lee Sulda; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13006464. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Banister, Larry) (Entered: 03/28/2017)

346 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#194) ATTORNEY Appearance for Shipping Quest, LLC by Sean Sullivan. (Sullivan, Sean) (Docket Text Modified on 10/30/2018 by Clerk's Office) (eaa, ). (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#193) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, attorneys Steven N. Fritzshall and Brad J. Pawloski's motion to withdraw as attorney for all defendants #188 is granted. Steven N. Fritzshall and Brad J. Pawloski are terminated as counsel of record for all defendants. For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff Wendy Lee Sulda's motions to seal document #181 , for preliminary injunction #171 , and to appoint receiver #170 are denied. The clerk is directed to remove the sealed filing #179 from the docket, and plaintiff shall file a public document with appropriate redactions. Plaintiff Sulda's motion for joinder #190 is taken under advisement. No appearance is necessary on the motion hearing set for 10/30/2018 at 9:45 a.m. Notices mailed. (jk, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#192) NOTICE of Motion by Larry Ford Banister, II for presentment of motion for joinder #190 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/30/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 10/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#191) MEMORANDUM by Wendy Lee Sulda in Opposition to motion to withdraw as attorney,,,, #188 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unreported Cases)(Banister, Larry) (Entered: 10/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#190) MOTION by Plaintiff Wendy Lee Sulda for joinder of Non-Parties Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(c) [Shimon Galapo, Stav Ben Haim, Diplomat Hallandale LLC and BH S Logistics LLC] (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#189) NOTICE of Motion by Steven Neal Fritzshall for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney,,,, #188 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/23/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Fritzshall, Steven) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#188) MOTION by Attorney Steven N. Fritzshall, Brad J. Pawlowski to withdraw as attorney for Albert Abramov, Price Break Shipping USA, LLC, Javier Sajnovsky, Shippingquest.com, LLC, Winston Dan Vogel. New address information: Winston Dan Vogel, info@shippingquest.com, oritgalapo@yahoo.com, winidan@hotmail.com, winstonvogel181@comcast.net, Javier Sajnovsky, info@shippingquest.com, chaim.sajnovsky@gmail.com, chaimsajnovsky@gmail.com, chaim@b7dev.com, Albert Abramov, info@shippingquest.com, shippingquest1@yahoo.com, info@pricebreakshipping.com, iaberto2005@yahoo.com, monicarod3333@yahoo.com, Shippingquest.com, LLC, info@shippingquest.com, oritgalapo@yahoo.com, winidan@hotmail.com, winstonvogel181@comcast.net, Price Break Shipping USA, LLC, info@shippingquest.com, oritgalapo@yahoo.com, winidan@hotmail.com, winstonvogel181@comcast.net (Attachments: #1 Notification of Party Contact Information)(Fritzshall, Steven) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#187) DECLARATION of L. Ford Banister, II Eleventh Amendment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Banister, Larry) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#186) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 09/25/18 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 32413. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, 312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2019. (Conway, Colleen) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#184) NOTICE of Motion by Larry Ford Banister, II for presentment of motion to appoint receiver #170 , motion to seal document #181 , motion for preliminary injunction #171 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/23/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 10/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
180 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DECLARATION of JESS BLOOMINGDALE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT ONE)(Banister, Larry) (Entered: 04/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAILED Trademark Request Letter to Plaintiffs counsel Larry Ford Banister, II. (aee, ) (Entered: 03/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: Status hearing set for 5/31/17 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2325. If, by the date of the scheduled status hearing, defendant has not been served, plaintiff should call the courtroom deputy (312-435-5641) to request a new status date. No status hearing should be held until all defendants have been served. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. Pursuant to LR 5.2(f), a stapled and/or bound paper copy of all electronically filed pleadings, including the complaint, must be delivered to chambers (2356) within one business day of filing. Noncompliance with LR 5.2(f) will result in the imposition of a $200.00 fine payable to the Clerk of the Court, 219 South Dearborn Street, 20th Floor, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 3/30/2017. Mailed notice(mjc, ) (Entered: 03/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DECLARATION of Larry Ford Banister, II (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Banister, Larry) (Entered: 03/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DECLARATION of WENDY LEE SULDA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Banister, Larry) (Entered: 03/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Wendy Lee Sulda to seal case (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 03/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wendy Lee Sulda by Larry Ford Banister, II (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 03/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. (meg, ) (Entered: 03/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Banister, Larry) (Entered: 03/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wendy Lee Sulda; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13006464. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Banister, Larry) (Entered: 03/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less