This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 15:16:26 (UTC).

Submar, Inc v. Bray et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 Submar, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bray. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and John T. Fowlkes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02647

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

John T. Fowlkes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Submar, Inc

Defendants

David G Bray

Bray, Skelton and Associates, Inc

The Bray Firm

The Bray-Davis Firm, Ltd., LLC

Bray & Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elizabeth B. Stengel

Attorney at Evans Petree, PC

1000 Ridgeway Loop, Suite 200

Memphis, TN 38120

Defendant Attorney

Jason Michael Pannu

Attorney at LEWIS, THOMASON, KING, KRIEG & WALDROP, P.C.

424 Church Street, Ste 2500

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Exhibit A proposed schedulng order

#14

(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A proposed schedulng order)(Stengel, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#13

(#13) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (pyb) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER Finding as moot DE #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/29/18. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Pannu, Jason) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

10 #1

Memorandum

#10

(#10) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Pannu, Jason) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Submar, Inc as to Bray, Skelton and Associates, Inc. (Stengel, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Submar, Inc as to David G Bray. (Stengel, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

1 #8

Summons Bray, Skelton and Associates, Inc

1 #7

Summons The Bray Firm

1 #6

Summons David G. Bray

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 Exxon Notice

1 #3

Exhibit 3 Exxon Purchase Order

1 #2

Exhibit 2 Bray Proposal

1 #1

Exhibit 1 Submar Proposal

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2884290), filed by Submar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Submar Proposal, #2 Exhibit 2 Bray Proposal, #3 Exhibit 3 Exxon Purchase Order, #4 Exhibit 4 Exxon Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons David G. Bray, #7 Summons The Bray Firm, #8 Summons Bray, Skelton and Associates, Inc)(Stengel, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A proposed schedulng order)(Stengel, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager. (pyb) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER Finding as moot DE #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 10/29/18. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Pannu, Jason) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Pannu, Jason) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Submar, Inc as to Bray, Skelton and Associates, Inc. (Stengel, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Submar, Inc as to David G Bray. (Stengel, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Submar, Inc as to The Bray Firm. (Stengel, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to David G Bray, Bray, Skelton and Associates, Inc. and The Bray Firm. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 The Bray Firm, #2 Bray Skelton & Associates)(jae) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2884290), filed by Submar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Submar Proposal, #2 Exhibit 2 Bray Proposal, #3 Exhibit 3 Exxon Purchase Order, #4 Exhibit 4 Exxon Notice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons David G. Bray, #7 Summons The Bray Firm, #8 Summons Bray, Skelton and Associates, Inc)(Stengel, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less