This case was last updated from PACER on 11/25/2018 at 08:05:28 (UTC).

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.10.96.207

Case Summary

On 09/26/2018 Strike 3 Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24 10 96 207. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller, Carolyn K. Delaney and Morrison C. England, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02638

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carolyn K. Delaney

Presiding Judges

Kimberly J. Mueller

Morrison C. England, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC

Defendant

John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lincoln Dee Bandlow

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd., Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

6 #3

Proposed Order

6 #2

Exhibit A-D Declarations

#7

(#7) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/14/18 GRANTING #6 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena within the scope of the order; plaintiff shall file a status report within 45 days; plaintiff is cautioned that, until permission is given by the court, it is not to reveal the identity of the defendant in or out of court. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#6

(#6) EX PARTE APPLICATION by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC for Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points And Authorities, #2 Exhibits A-D Declarations, #3 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) Modified on 10/29/2018 (Washington, S). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

6 #1

Memorandum of Points And Authorities

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill: Due to the pending retirement of Magistrate Judge *Gregory G. Hollows* from the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned to *Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney* for all further proceedings. (Donati, J) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#4

(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

4 #1

Consent Form

4 #2

VDRP

#3

(#3) ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 10/4/18 REASSIGNING the captioned actions listed in this order to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., and U.S. Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. All future filings shall denote the reassignment to U.S. District Judge England and U.S. Magistrate Judge Hollows by replacing the trailing initials on each case number with MCE-GGH. The 1/31/19 Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby VACATED. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

2 #4

VDRP

#2

(#2) COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019, at 02:30 PM, in Courtroom 3 (KJM), before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 Copyright Report, #4 VDRP) (York, M) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

2 #1

Standing Order

2 #2

Consent Form

2 #3

Copyright Report

1 #4

Notice Of Filing Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement

1 #3

Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons

1 #5

Copyright Report

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/14/18 GRANTING #6 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena within the scope of the order; plaintiff shall file a status report within 45 days; plaintiff is cautioned that, until permission is given by the court, it is not to reveal the identity of the defendant in or out of court. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EX PARTE APPLICATION by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC for Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points And Authorities, #2 Exhibits A-D Declarations, #3 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) Modified on 10/29/2018 (Washington, S). (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill: Due to the pending retirement of Magistrate Judge *Gregory G. Hollows* from the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned to *Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney* for all further proceedings. (Donati, J) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 10/4/18 REASSIGNING the captioned actions listed in this order to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., and U.S. Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. All future filings shall denote the reassignment to U.S. District Judge England and U.S. Magistrate Judge Hollows by replacing the trailing initials on each case number with MCE-GGH. The 1/31/19 Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby VACATED. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019, at 02:30 PM, in Courtroom 3 (KJM), before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 Copyright Report, #4 VDRP) (York, M) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.10.96.207 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Attorney Bandlow, Lincoln Dee added. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-7890717) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons, #4 Notice Of Filing Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #5 Copyright Report) (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less