This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2018 at 07:20:13 (UTC).

STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. DOE

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against DOE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellen S. Huvelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02210

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ellen S. Huvelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Haire

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

1030 15Th Street, Nw, Suite 380 East

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

3 #3

Affidavit Pasquale

3 #6

Memorandum in Support

#2

(#2) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC for STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (zsb) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

1 #1

Errata A

3 #5

Text of Proposed Order

3 #2

Affidavit Fieser

3 #4

Affidavit Stalzer

1 #3

Corporate Disclosure

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 plaintiff's motion for leave to serve third party subpoena. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 16, 2018. (lcesh1) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5703309) filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure)(Haire, Jessica) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #1

Affidavit Lansky

#3

(#3) MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lansky, #2 Affidavit Fieser, #3 Affidavit Pasquale, #4 Affidavit Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Memorandum in Support)(Haire, Jessica) (Entered: 10/20/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/30/2019. (gdf) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #3 plaintiff's motion for leave to serve third party subpoena. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 16, 2018. (lcesh1) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lansky, #2 Affidavit Fieser, #3 Affidavit Pasquale, #4 Affidavit Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Memorandum in Support)(Haire, Jessica) (Entered: 10/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (zsb) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC for STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (zsb) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5703309) filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure)(Haire, Jessica) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.