This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2018 at 07:35:42 (UTC).

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 Strike 3 Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa L. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01334

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa L. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Strike 3 Holdings, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacqueline M. James

Attorney at The James Law Firm PPLC

445 Hamilton Avenue, Suite 1102

White Plains, NY 10601

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/18/2018 (Lindberg, Christina) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

9 #6

Text of Proposed Order

9 #5

Exhibit D

9 #4

Exhibit C

9 #3

Exhibit B

9 #2

Exhibit A

9 #1

Memorandum in Support

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.Responses due by 10/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

8 #1

Complaint and Attachment

#8

(#8) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachment) (Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #5 Standing Protective Order, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices Signed by Clerk on 08/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/09/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/09/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/09/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2018. Discovery due by 2/8/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2019. Signed by Clerk on 08/09/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4930639.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Cover Sheet)(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/18/2018 (Lindberg, Christina) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.Responses due by 10/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachment) (Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, #5 Standing Protective Order, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices Signed by Clerk on 08/13/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/09/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/09/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/09/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2018. Discovery due by 2/8/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2019. Signed by Clerk on 08/09/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4930639.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Cover Sheet)(James, Jacqueline) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.