This case was last updated from PACER on 04/15/2019 at 00:13:29 (UTC).

Strickland v. Demke et al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2013 Strickland filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Demke. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dee Benson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:13-CV-01130

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dee Benson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jake M. Strickland

Defendants

Whitney Vivian Demke

David J. Hardy

Larry S. Jenkins

Kirton & McConkie

Pamela Taylor

Wood Crapo LLC

J. T. Y.

Wood Jenkins LLC

J. K. Y.

LDS Family Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wesley D. Hutchins

Attorney at THE HUTCHINS LAW FIRM PC

6751 S Adventure Wy

West Jordan, UT 84081

Defendant Attorneys

Rick L. Rose

Attorney at RAY QUINNEY & NEBEKER PC

36 S State St Ste 1400, Po Box 45385

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-0385

Adam Kenji Richards

Attorney at RAY QUINNEY & NEBEKER PC

36 S State St Ste 1400, Po Box 45385

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-0385

Laura G. Kennedy

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Robert S. Clark

Attorney at PARR BROWN GEE & LOVELESS

101 S 200 E Ste 700

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Breanne D. Fors

10219 Hidden Pond Dr

Highland, UT 84003

Douglas P. Farr

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER LLP

15 W South Temple Ste 1200, Gateway Tower West

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Alan L. Sullivan

Attorney at SNELL & WILMER (UT)

15 W South Temple Ste 1200, Gateway Tower West

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

James Delos Gardner

Attorney at NO ADDRESS

Monica S. Call

Attorney at STOEL RIVES

201 S Main St Ste 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-4904

Kenneth B. Black

Attorney at STOEL RIVES

201 S Main St Ste 1100

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-4904

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

#3

(#3) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

#7

(#7) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

#90

(#90) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Breanne D. Fors filed by Breanne D. Fors on behalf of David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie (Fors, Breanne) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

#2

(#9) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

#91

(#91) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Plaintiffs are directed to respond in writing within 14 days from the date of this order and inform the Court of the status of the case and intentions to proceed. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/3/16. (jlw) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

#8

(#8) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

#9

(#9) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

#5

(#5) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

#96

(#96) CLERK'S JUDGMENT signed by Chief Deputy Clerk - AWM. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's case is dismissed without prejudice. Case Closed. (blh) (Entered: 04/06/2017)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (blh) (Entered: 12/27/2013)

#6

(#6) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

89 #1

Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Decl of Robert S. Clark

#94

(#94) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff is directed to respond in writing within 10 days from the date of this order and inform the Court of the status of the case and intentions to proceed. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/17/2017. (blh) (Entered: 03/21/2017)

#95

(#95) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/5/2017. (blh) (Entered: 04/05/2017)

#92

(#92) Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time To File Proposed Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Case Management Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Hutchins, Wesley) (Entered: 04/28/2016)

#93

(#93) ORDER Not Dismissing Case: On April 3, 2016, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why Plaintiffs case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. On April 28, 2016, Plaintiff responded to the Courts Order, and explained that Plaintiff intends to pursue the action. Given Plaintiffs response, the Court declines to dismiss Plaintiffs case at this time. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/29/16. (jlw) (Entered: 04/29/2016)

#89

(#89) REPLY BRIEF re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Decl of Robert S. Clark)(Kennedy, Laura) (Entered: 03/30/2015)

174 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) CLERK'S JUDGMENT signed by Chief Deputy Clerk - AWM. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's case is dismissed without prejudice. Case Closed. (blh) (Entered: 04/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/5/2017. (blh) (Entered: 04/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff is directed to respond in writing within 10 days from the date of this order and inform the Court of the status of the case and intentions to proceed. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/17/2017. (blh) (Entered: 03/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) ORDER Not Dismissing Case: On April 3, 2016, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why Plaintiffs case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. On April 28, 2016, Plaintiff responded to the Courts Order, and explained that Plaintiff intends to pursue the action. Given Plaintiffs response, the Court declines to dismiss Plaintiffs case at this time. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/29/16. (jlw) (Entered: 04/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#92) Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time To File Proposed Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Case Management Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Hutchins, Wesley) (Entered: 04/28/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Plaintiffs are directed to respond in writing within 14 days from the date of this order and inform the Court of the status of the case and intentions to proceed. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/3/16. (jlw) (Entered: 04/04/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Breanne D. Fors filed by Breanne D. Fors on behalf of David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie (Fors, Breanne) (Entered: 05/05/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) REPLY BRIEF re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Decl of Robert S. Clark)(Kennedy, Laura) (Entered: 03/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #87 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support (Motion to Strike Clark Declaration) filed by Defendants David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie. (Kennedy, Laura) (Entered: 03/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#87) Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support (Motion to Strike Clark Declaration) filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A; Clark Declaration)(Hutchins, Wesley) (Entered: 03/12/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jake M. Strickland as to Kirton & McConkie. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed using incorrect event type document is a summons to be issued. (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT Pages 1 through 10 against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-1969920), filed by Jake M. Strickland. Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls). (Entered: 12/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (blh) (Entered: 12/27/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.