This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:00 (UTC).

Stow v. Davis et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Stow filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Davis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrea K. Johnstone and Joseph N. Laplante. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00768

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andrea K. Johnstone

Presiding Judge

Joseph N. Laplante

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Weston J. Stow

Berlin, NH 03570

Defendants

George Corriveau

Anne Davis

Not Yet Classified

NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)

NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Addendum Part 2

4 #1

Cover Letter

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhaustion of Remedies

1 #6

Exhibits A1-H1

1 #9

Cover Letter

#5

(#5) STATUS REPORT by Weston J. Stow (ko) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#4

(#4) STATUS UPDATE by Weston J. Stow (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(jb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

1 #5

Exhibits A-Z

1 #10

Table of Contents

1 #2

Summonses

1 #7

Sentencing Structure

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #11

Envelope

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs as to Weston Stow, initial fee of $23.33. In addition, monthly payments of 20% of each preceding month's income credited to the plaintiff's account shall be remitted by the Institution when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350.00 has been paid. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Finance Follow Up Deadline 10/29/2018. (lml) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

1 #3

Addendum Part 1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #5 Status Report. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATUS REPORT by Weston J. Stow (ko) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #4 Status Update. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATUS UPDATE by Weston J. Stow (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(jb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs as to Weston Stow, initial fee of $23.33. In addition, monthly payments of 20% of each preceding month's income credited to the plaintiff's account shall be remitted by the Institution when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350.00 has been paid. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Finance Follow Up Deadline 10/29/2018. (lml) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-768-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs with Custodial Certificate and Prisoner Consent Form filed by Weston J. Stow. (mc) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against George Corriveau, Anne Davis filed by Weston J. Stow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses, #3 Addendum Part 1, #4 Addendum Part 2, #5 Exhibits A-Z, #6 Exhibits A1-H1, #7 Sentencing Structure, #8 Exhaustion of Remedies, #9 Cover Letter, #10 Table of Contents, #11 Envelope) (mc) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.