This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2018 at 07:49:36 (UTC).

Stovall v. Berman & Rabin, PA

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 Stovall filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Berman Rabin, PA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00226

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Stovall

Defendant

Berman & Rabin, PA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Victor R. Wandres

Attorney at Paramount Law

4835 S Peoria Ave, Ste 1

Tulsa, OK 74105

Defendant Attorney

George William Velotta, II

Attorney at Berman & Rabin, PA

12101 N Macarthur Blvd, Ste A

Oklahoma City, OK 73162-1800

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing parties to file their Disclosures and Joint Status Report no later than 10/1/2018 (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Berman & Rabin, P.A. for Berman & Rabin, PA) by Berman & Rabin, PA (Velotta, George) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Berman & Rabin, PA [NOTE: Attorney George William Velotta, II added to party Berman & Rabin, PA(pty:dft)]. (Velotta, George) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

5 #2

Exhibit 2 Green Card Returned

5 #1

Exhibit 1 Summons

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Berman & Rabin, PA - Served on 7/27/2018. by Michael Stovall (With attachments)(Wandres, Victor) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Berman & Rabin, PA (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Berman & Rabin, PA by Michael Stovall (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michael Stovall (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing parties to file their Disclosures and Joint Status Report no later than 10/1/2018 (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Berman & Rabin, P.A. for Berman & Rabin, PA) by Berman & Rabin, PA (Velotta, George) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Berman & Rabin, PA [NOTE: Attorney George William Velotta, II added to party Berman & Rabin, PA(pty:dft)]. (Velotta, George) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Berman & Rabin, PA - Served on 7/27/2018. by Michael Stovall (With attachments)(Wandres, Victor) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Berman & Rabin, PA (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/19/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1193234 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Michael Stovall (Wandres, Victor) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (Filing Fee due by 7/26/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Berman & Rabin, PA by Michael Stovall (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michael Stovall (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less