This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2019 at 07:45:43 (UTC).

Stone et al v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 Stone filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00598

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Norwood E Stone

Maria D Stone

Defendant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steve C. Horowitz

Attorney at Milazzo Webb Law, PLLC

5821 Fairview Road, Suite 500

Charlotte, NC 28209

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by Maria D Stone (Horowitz, Steve) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#4

(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Norwood E Stone (Horowitz, Steve) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Steve C. Horowitz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Horowitz, Steve) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to United States of America and the US Attorney. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

1 #22

Proposed Summons US Attorney Washington

1 #21

Proposed Summons US Attorney Raleigh

1 #20

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #19

Exhibit R- Second Claim for Refund

1 #17

Exhibit P- Form 1045

1 #8

Exhibit G- Examination Report

1 #7

Exhibit F-Correspondence 10/18/2010

1 #6

Exhibit E- Correspondence 08/18/2018

1 #5

Exhibit D-Correspondence 12/04/2009

1 #4

Exhibit C- Plaintiffs 2008 Tax Return

1 #3

Exhibit B- Transcript for 2008 Tax Year

1 #2

Exhibit A-Form 4868

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit List

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4767663.), filed by Norwood E Stone, Maria D Stone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A-Form 4868, #3 Exhibit B- Transcript for 2008 Tax Year, #4 Exhibit C- Plaintiffs 2008 Tax Return, #5 Exhibit D-Correspondence 12/04/2009, #6 Exhibit E- Correspondence 08/18/2018, #7 Exhibit F-Correspondence 10/18/2010, #8 Exhibit G- Examination Report, #9 Exhibit H-Notice of Deficiency, #10 Exhibit I- Notice CP21E, #11 Exhibit J-Refund Check, #12 Exhibit K-Duplicate Amended 2008 Tax Return, #13 Exhibit L- Transcript for 2011 Tax Year, #14 Exhibit M-Request for Quick or Prompt Assessment, #15 Exhibit N-Transcript for 2013 Tax Year, #16 Exhibit O-2013 Tax Return, #17 Exhibit P- Form 1045, #18 Exhibit Q-First Claim for Refund, #19 Exhibit R- Second Claim for Refund, #20 Civil Cover Sheet, #21 Proposed Summons US Attorney Raleigh, #22 Proposed Summons US Attorney Washington) (Horowitz, Steve) (Attachment 22 flattened and replaced on 12/21/2018) (Edwards, S.). (Entered: 12/21/2018)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Financial Disclosure Statement by Maria D Stone (Horowitz, Steve) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Norwood E Stone (Horowitz, Steve) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Steve C. Horowitz on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Horowitz, Steve) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to United States of America and the US Attorney. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the summons prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Notice to Counsel -Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Maria D Stone, Norwood E Stone. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4767663.), filed by Norwood E Stone, Maria D Stone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A-Form 4868, #3 Exhibit B- Transcript for 2008 Tax Year, #4 Exhibit C- Plaintiffs 2008 Tax Return, #5 Exhibit D-Correspondence 12/04/2009, #6 Exhibit E- Correspondence 08/18/2018, #7 Exhibit F-Correspondence 10/18/2010, #8 Exhibit G- Examination Report, #9 Exhibit H-Notice of Deficiency, #10 Exhibit I- Notice CP21E, #11 Exhibit J-Refund Check, #12 Exhibit K-Duplicate Amended 2008 Tax Return, #13 Exhibit L- Transcript for 2011 Tax Year, #14 Exhibit M-Request for Quick or Prompt Assessment, #15 Exhibit N-Transcript for 2013 Tax Year, #16 Exhibit O-2013 Tax Return, #17 Exhibit P- Form 1045, #18 Exhibit Q-First Claim for Refund, #19 Exhibit R- Second Claim for Refund, #20 Civil Cover Sheet, #21 Proposed Summons US Attorney Raleigh, #22 Proposed Summons US Attorney Washington) (Horowitz, Steve) (Attachment 22 flattened and replaced on 12/21/2018) (Edwards, S.). (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less