This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2019 at 07:38:39 (UTC).

Stillion v. Pelaez-Milian

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 Stillion filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Pelaez-Milian. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is W. Carleton Metcalf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00331

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

W. Carleton Metcalf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stacy John Stillion

Defendant

Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd R. Cerwin

Attorney at Cerwin Law Firm, P.C.

522 S. Dekalb Street

Shelby, NC 28150

Defendant Attorney

Caroline P. Stutts

1986, 603 St. Mary'S Street

Raleigh, NC 27605

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Joint Stipulation of CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by all parties. (Cerwin, Todd) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian.(Stutts, Caroline) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Removal filed with the State Court by Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian (Stutts, Caroline) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian (Stutts, Caroline) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

2 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal

2 #2

Exhibit B Affidavit of Compliance

2 #1

Exhibit A Civil Summons and Complaint

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3864396), filed by Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Civil Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Compliance, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal)(Stutts, Caroline) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline P. Stutts on behalf of Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian (Stutts, Caroline) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. District Judge Martin Reidinger no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kby) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint Stipulation of CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by all parties. (Cerwin, Todd) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • (#6) ***Please Disregard, see Docket Entry #7 for Corrected Joint Stipulation of Consent.*** NOTICE of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Stacy John Stillion (Cerwin, Todd) Modified text on 1/3/2019 (kby). (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 1/3/2019. (emw) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian.(Stutts, Caroline) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Removal filed with the State Court by Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian (Stutts, Caroline) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Notice to Attorney Todd R. Cerwin: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 11/23/2018. (ejb) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian (Stutts, Caroline) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3864396), filed by Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Civil Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Affidavit of Compliance, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal)(Stutts, Caroline) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline P. Stutts on behalf of Carlos Ernesto Pelaez-Milian (Stutts, Caroline) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less