This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2019 at 07:41:42 (UTC).

Stigler v. Waterloo, Iowa, City of et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 Stigler filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Waterloo, Iowa, City of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly Mahoney and CJ Williams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-02086

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly Mahoney

Presiding Judge

CJ Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jordan Stigler

Defendants

Ben Bloker

Rob Michael

Waterloo, Iowa, City of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David A O'Brien

Attorney at Dave O'Brien Law

1500 Center Street Ne, Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52402

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jordan Stigler. Ben Bloker waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (O'Brien, David) Modified on 11/28/2018 to correct dates (des) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jordan Stigler. Rob Michael waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (O'Brien, David) Modified on 11/28/2018 to correct dates (des) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jordan Stigler. Waterloo, Iowa, City of waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (O'Brien, David) Modified on 11/28/2018 to correct dates (des) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

2 #1

Civil Actions new case packet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Ben Bloker, Rob Michael, Waterloo, Iowa, City of. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2809334.), filed by Jordan Stigler. Scheduling Report due by 2/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Brien, David) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jordan Stigler. Ben Bloker waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (O'Brien, David) Modified on 11/28/2018 to correct dates (des) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jordan Stigler. Rob Michael waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (O'Brien, David) Modified on 11/28/2018 to correct dates (des) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jordan Stigler. Waterloo, Iowa, City of waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (O'Brien, David) Modified on 11/28/2018 to correct dates (des) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Ben Bloker, Rob Michael, Waterloo, Iowa, City of. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Actions new case packet) (des) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DOCKET Annotation: Case opened in wrong division as case number 18cv117 - clerk notified Financial Department and attorney of corrected case number (des) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2809334.), filed by Jordan Stigler. Scheduling Report due by 2/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Brien, David) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.