This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:52:39 (UTC).

Stewart v. Juarez et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Stewart filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Juarez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Houston, Andrew G. Schopler and Linda Lopez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02291

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Houston

Referral Judges

Andrew G. Schopler

Linda Lopez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larry Stewart

Vacaville, CA 95696

Defendants

J. Juarez

M. Rodriguez

N. Garsilano

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against N. Garsilano, J. Juarez, M. Rodriguez, filed by Larry Stewart.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2291-JAH-AGS. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms) (jao). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Larry Stewart (jms) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Stewart. (jms) (jao). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18CV2291-JAH(LL). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/07/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Proceed in Above Mentioned Civil Matter by Serving Subpoenas upon Defendants via U.S. Marshal Service by Larry Stewart. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/22/2018.(jms) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#3

(#3) Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Accepting Document: Motion/Request to Proceed in Above Mentioned Civil Matter by Serving Subpoenas upon Defendants via U.S. Marshal Service, from Plaintiff Larry Stewart. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, OTHER: Premature. IFP Motion (ECF No. 2) remains pending; Complaint requires screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A.. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/22/2018. Signed by the Chambers of Judge John A. Houston on 10/23/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Larry Stewart (jms) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez for all further proceedings. The new case number is 18CV2291-JAH(LL). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/07/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Proceed in Above Mentioned Civil Matter by Serving Subpoenas upon Defendants via U.S. Marshal Service by Larry Stewart. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/22/2018.(jms) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Accepting Document: Motion/Request to Proceed in Above Mentioned Civil Matter by Serving Subpoenas upon Defendants via U.S. Marshal Service, from Plaintiff Larry Stewart. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, OTHER: Premature. IFP Motion (ECF No. 2) remains pending; Complaint requires screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A.. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/22/2018. Signed by the Chambers of Judge John A. Houston on 10/23/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Stewart. (jms) (jao). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against N. Garsilano, J. Juarez, M. Rodriguez, filed by Larry Stewart.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2291-JAH-AGS. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms) (jao). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.