This case was last updated from PACER on 09/01/2018 at 07:34:33 (UTC).

Stewart v. Enterprise Bank

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 Stewart filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Enterprise Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00607

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr

 

Party Details

Appellant

James Richard Stewart, III

Salem, NH 03079

Appellee

Enterprise Bank

Us Trustee

US Trustee

Not Yet Classified

US Bankruptcy Court - NH, Clerk - Notice Only (Court Use Only)

Trustee

Lawrence P. Sumski

Manchester, NH 03101

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Kathleen Erica McKenzie

Attorney at DiLucci Professional Association

81 South State St

Concord, NH 03301

Appellee Attorneys

Nicholas A. Kanakis

Attorney at Merra and Kanakis PC

159 Main St

Nashua, NH 03060

Mark D. Kanakis

Attorney at Merra and Kanakis PC

159 Main St

Nashua, NH 03060

Trustee Attorney

Lawrence P. Sumski

Attorney at Sumski Law Office

1000 Elm St., 10Th Fl.

Manchester, NH 03101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (Bankruptcy Court case number 18-10398-BAH) filed by James Richard Stewart, III.(mc) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by James Richard Stewart, III. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Enterprise Bank shall file a disclosure statement by July 12, 2018. Disclosure Statement due 7/12/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-607-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (Bankruptcy Court case number 18-10398-BAH) filed by James Richard Stewart, III.(mc) (Entered: 07/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.