This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 12:04:00 (UTC).

Stephens v. Ziegmann et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 Stephens filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ziegmann. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P. Shreder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00195

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P. Shreder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlis G. Stephens

Defendants

Eric Fleming

Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc.

John Chagnon

Rural King Distribution & Management, Inc.

Robert Caven

N.P.Z., Inc.

Thielen Marketing, Inc.

Fleming Outdoors, LLC

Stephen Chick

Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc.

Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC

Shawn Inglis

Jay Berlin

Rural King Holdings, LLP

Tina Schultz

Neil P. Ziegmann

Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC

Timothy Caven

Jeb Hollingshead

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M. Duree

Attorney at David M. Duree and Associates, PC

Po Box 1416

O'Fallon, IL 62269

Defendant Attorneys

Glenn L. Johnson

Attorney at Nyemaster and Goode

625 1St St Se, Ste 400

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

Jeffrey D. Harty

Attorney at Nyemaster and Goode

625 1St St Se, Ste 400

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

Ryan G. Koopmans

Attorney at Nyemaster and Goode

625 1St St Se, Ste 400

Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

David Lee Heinemann

Attorney at Shank and Moore, LLC

1968 Shawnee Mission Pkwy, Ste 100

Mission Woods, KS 66205

Matthew L. Cutler

Attorney at HARNESS AND DICKEY

7700 Bonhomme, Suite 400

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#156

(#156) RESPONSE to Motion re #154 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Duree, David) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/25/2018)

#155

(#155) RESPONSE to Motion re #153 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Duree, David) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/25/2018)

154 #1

Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#154

(#154) MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendant Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/18/2018)

153 #1

Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#153

(#153) MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/18/2018)

#151

(#152) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #151 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Defendants' Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Neil P. Ziegmann. (Harty, Jeffrey) filed by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann; GRANTED. DEFENDANTS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING JUNE 18, 2018 TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING; HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/7/18. (CLA) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/07/2018)

147 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#147

(#157) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #147 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by Carlis G Stephens; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/26/18. (KJS) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

1 #32

Original Filing Form

1 #31

Summons Eric Fleming

1 #20

Summons John Chagnon

1 #19

Summons Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc. d/b/a PCS Outdoors

1 #18

Summons Harry Nestell

1 #17

Summons Shawn Inglis

1 #16

Summons Inglis Farms, Inc. d/b/a F & T Fur Harvesters Trading Post

1 #15

Summons Robert Caven

1 #4

Exhibit C

302 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2018
  • Docket***REMARK - The Patent infringement claims against Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc. d/b/a PCS Outdoors and John Chagnon were electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Michigan. (KJS) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Docket***REMARK - The Patent infringement claims against James R. Thielen, Thielen Marketing, Inc., The Sportsmans Guide, Inc., Jay Berlin and Cumberlands Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc. were electronically transferred to the District of Minnesota. (KJS)[Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Docket***REMARK - The Patent infringement claims against Tina Dugan f/k/a Tina Schultz were electronically transferred to the Northern District, Central Division of Iowa. (KJS) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Docket***REMARK - The Patent infringement claims against Neil P. Ziegmann and N.P.Z., Inc. were electronically transferred to the Northern District, Western Division of Iowa. (KJS) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#157) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #147 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by Carlis G Stephens; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/26/18. (KJS) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#156) RESPONSE to Motion re #154 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Duree, David) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#155) RESPONSE to Motion re #153 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. (Duree, David) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#154) MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendant Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#153) MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Harty, Jeffrey) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#152) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #151 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Defendants' Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants N.P.Z., Inc., Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, Neil P. Ziegmann. (Harty, Jeffrey) filed by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, N.P.Z., Inc., Neil P. Ziegmann; GRANTED. DEFENDANTS GRANTED UP TO AND INCLUDING JUNE 18, 2018 TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING; HEA. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/7/18. (CLA) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
144 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens Process Server: Billy Wingate of Jones & Associates, Inc. (Duree, David) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens Process Server: Josh Douthit of Elite Processing Serving (Duree, David) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens Process Server: James Hildebrand of Iowa Process Service (Duree, David) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens Process Server: Scott Hadley of Had-Fam Investigation & Legal Services (Duree, David) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens Process Server: Gerald Lundsford of Pro-Serve (Duree, David) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens Process Server: Christine Heuer of Legal Process of MN, LLC (Duree, David) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent. (BAK) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • Case Opening Notification: 24 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney David M. Duree. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (BAK) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/18/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Carlis G Stephens. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Duree, David) [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-4914012, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Carlis G Stephens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Summons Neil Ziegmann, #9 Summons N.P.Z., Inc., #10 Summons Tina Schultz, #11 Summons Thielen Marketing, Inc., #12 Summons James Thielen, #13 Summons Minnesota Trapline Products, Inc., #14 Summons Timothy Caven, #15 Summons Robert Caven, #16 Summons Inglis Farms, Inc. , #17 Summons Shawn Inglis, #18 Summons Harry Nestell, #19 Summons Phoenix Composite Solutions, Inc. , #20 Summons John Chagnon, #21 Summons Cumberland's Northwest Trappers Supply, Inc., #22 Summons Rural King Distribution & Management, Inc., #23 Summons Orswcheln Farm and Home, LLC, #24 Summons Stephen Chick, #25 Summons Justin Chick, #26 Summons Jeb Hollingshead, #27 Summons Okie Cable & Trap Supply, LLC, #28 Summons Jay Berlin, #29 Summons The Sportsman's Guide, Inc., #30 Summons Fleming Outdoors, LLC, #31 Summons Eric Fleming)(Duree, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2015: #32 Original Filing Form) (BAK). [Transferred from moed on 6/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/17/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less