Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2018 at 08:05:00 (UTC).

Stephens v. Carpenter et al.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 Stephens filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Carpenter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard D. Bennett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02826

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard D. Bennett

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lee E. Stephens, Jr.

Respondents

Brian Frosh

Terry Royal

Warden Dayena M. Corcoran

Stephen T Moyer

Mike Carpenter

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : Denying #10 petitioner's Motion to Stay and transferring case to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland for all further proceedings. See 28 U.S.C. 1631. (case terminated) (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#18

(#18) ORDER Consolidating Civil Action RDB 18-2826 with Civil Action RDB 18-493; Clerk shall docket all pleadings filed in Civil Action RDB 18-2826 in Civil Action RDB 18-493; Order directing Clerk to close Civil Action RDB 18-2826. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/11/2018. (c/m 10/11/18)(ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

16 #1

*Restricted*

#16

(#16) Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:18-cv-00053. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#12

(#12) Further NOTICE Regarding Motion to Stay (Re: #10 MOTION to Stay Federal Habeas Petition) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

11 #1

Exhibit A-Order

#11

(#11) NOTICE Regarding Motion to Stay (Re: #10 MOTION to Stay Federal Habeas Petition ) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (With attachments)(Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

#10

(#11) NOTICE Regarding Motion to Stay (Re: #10 MOTION to Stay Federal Habeas Petition ) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (With attachments)(Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

#9

(#9) EXHIBITS Vol. 6 (App. 26-43) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#8

(#8) EXHIBITS VOL. 5 (App. 22-25) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#7

(#7) EXHIBITS VOL.4 (App. 16-21) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#6

(#6) EXHIBITS VOL. 3 (App. 12-15) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#4

(#4) EXHIBITS VOL. 1 (App. 1-8) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Form Information for Petition

#2

(#9) EXHIBITS Vol. 6 (App. 26-43) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/20/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/20/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (18-493). (ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Cases associated: Create association to 1:18-cv-00493-RDB. (ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER Consolidating Civil Action RDB 18-2826 with Civil Action RDB 18-493; Clerk shall docket all pleadings filed in Civil Action RDB 18-2826 in Civil Action RDB 18-493; Order directing Clerk to close Civil Action RDB 18-2826. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/11/2018. (c/m 10/11/18)(ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER giving counsel 21 days within this Order to notify the court why case number 18-493-RDB and case number 18-2826-RDB should not be consolidated. Clerk shall send a copy of this order to counsel in case number 18-493-RDB and case number 18-2826-RDB. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 9/12/2018. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(C/M-09-14-2018) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:18-cv-00053. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : Denying #10 petitioner's Motion to Stay and transferring case to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland for all further proceedings. See 28 U.S.C. 1631. (case terminated) (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • (#14) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West :Substituting Mike Carpenter, Interim Warden, as the respondent in this case. Petitioner is incarcerated at Oklahoma State Penitentiary in McAlester, Oklahoma, and Mike Carpenter is the Interim Warden of that facility. See Rule 2(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases; Braden v. 30th Judicial Circuit Court of Ky., 410 U.S. 484, 494-95 (1973). The case name is hereby changed to Lee E. Stephens, Jr., Petitioner, v. Mike Carpenter, Interim Warden, Respondent.(acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • (#13) MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-18-53-JHP-KEW. (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Further NOTICE Regarding Motion to Stay (Re: #10 MOTION to Stay Federal Habeas Petition) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE Regarding Motion to Stay (Re: #10 MOTION to Stay Federal Habeas Petition ) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (With attachments)(Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EXHIBITS Vol. 6 (App. 26-43) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) EXHIBITS VOL. 5 (App. 22-25) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXHIBITS VOL.4 (App. 16-21) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EXHIBITS VOL. 3 (App. 12-15) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXHIBITS VOL. 2 (App. 9-11) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EXHIBITS VOL. 1 (App. 1-8) (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 2/20/2018 in the amount of $5, receipt number 1086-1155242 (Re: #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 ) by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $5 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling (Filing Fee due by 2/27/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (With attachment) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/20/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/20/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Lee E. Stephens, Jr (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/20/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mike Carpenter is a litigant