This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2018 at 20:51:00 (UTC).

Stephen Harris et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2016 Stephen Harris filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenly Kiya Kato and Christina A. Snyder. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:16-CV-00645

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stephen Harris

Ozelia Harris

Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

NBS Default Services, LLC

Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Monique Harris

7615 Etiwanda Avenue

Etiwanda, CA 91739

Defendant Attorney

Lynette Gridiron Winston

Attorney at Anglin Flewlling Rasmussen Campbell and Trytten LLP

199 South Los Robles Suite 600

Pasadena, CA 91101-2459

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Dkt. 16 , filed May 16, 2016) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court finds this motion appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; C.D. Cal. Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing date of June 20, 2016, is vacated, and the matter is hereby taken under submission. In accordance with the foregoing, the Court GRANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Wells Fargos motion to dismiss the FAC pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Plaintiffs are hereby granted thirty (30) days in which to file an amended complaint. Failure to file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies identified herein may result in dismissal of plaintiffs claims with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (clee)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Dkt. 16 , filed May 16, 2016) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court finds this motion appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; C.D. Cal. Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing date of June 20, 2016, is vacated, and the matter is hereby taken under submission. In accordance with the foregoing, the Court GRANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Wells Fargos motion to dismiss the FAC pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Plaintiffs are hereby granted thirty (30) days in which to file an amended complaint. Failure to file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies identified herein may result in dismissal of plaintiffs claims with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (clee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NBS Default Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monique Harris