This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2018 at 07:17:14 (UTC).

STATEWIDE BONDING, INC et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2018 STATEWIDE BONDING, INC filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Boasberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02519

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Boasberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC

MIKE DONOVAN

STATEWIDE BONDING, INC

NEXUS SERVICES, INC.

Defendants

JODY M. PRESCOTT

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

THOMAS HOMAN

KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN

JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III

Nw, DC 20530

RONALD D. VITIELLO

MATTHEW G. WHITAKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John M. Shoreman

Attorney at MCFADDEN & SHOREMAN, LLC

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20036

Mario Bernanrd Williams

Attorney at NEXUS DERECHOS HUMANOS ATTORNEYS, INC.

44 Broad Street, Nw, Suite 200

Atlanta, GA 30303

Mario B. Williams

Attorney at NEXUS DERECHOS HUMANOS ATTORNEYS, INC.

44 Broad Street, Nw, Suite 200

Atlanta, GA 30303

Dallas S. LePierre

Attorney at NEXUS DERECHOS HUMANOS ATTORNEYS, INC.

Suite 200, 44 Broad Street, Nw

Atlanta, GA 30303

Defendant Attorney

Rhonda Lisa Campbell

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JODY M. PRESCOTT, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#23

(#23) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to RONALD D. VITIELLO, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER. (tth) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

17 #1

Exhibit Entry in WDVA Case

#17

Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2018 re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Order forthcoming from chambers. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (zjd) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

14 #1

Summons Proposed Summons for Vitiello and Whitaker

#14

(#25) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JODY M. PRESCOTT, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mario B. Williams, :Firm- Nexus Derechos Humanos Attorneys, Inc., :Address- 44 Broad Street NW, Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-254-0442. Fax No. - 703-935-2453 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5780427. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC., STATEWIDE BONDING, INC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mario Williams)(Shoreman, John) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

5 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

4 #1

Exhibit Ex 1 - Bond Management Handbook

#4

MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons discussed at today's hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiffs' #17 TRO Motion is DENIED; 2) Plaintiffs' #4 Motion for Declaratory Judgment is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as superseded by their Amended Complaint; and 3) The parties shall appear for a telephone conference call on December 11, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. to discuss further proceedings in the case. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/4/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 15-2115. (zsb) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

1 #3

Summons Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Related Case Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND MANDAMUS RELIEF against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5766359) filed by NEXUS SERVICES, INC., BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, STATEWIDE BONDING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Related Case Form, #3 Summons Proposed Summons)(Shoreman, John) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 1/17/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Consent #25 Motion for Extension of Time and ORDERS that they shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by January 17, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/11/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JODY M. PRESCOTT, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's conference call, the Court ORDERS that Defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint by December 14, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/11/2018. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge James E. Boasberg. (lsj) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons discussed at today's hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiffs' #17 TRO Motion is DENIED; 2) Plaintiffs' #4 Motion for Declaratory Judgment is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as superseded by their Amended Complaint; and 3) The parties shall appear for a telephone conference call on December 11, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. to discuss further proceedings in the case. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/4/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2018 re #17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Order forthcoming from chambers. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (zjd) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to RONALD D. VITIELLO, MATTHEW G. WHITAKER. (tth) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) RESPONSE re #21 MOTION to Strike re 17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order supplemental briefing filed by THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JODY M. PRESCOTT, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III., and 24 RESPONSE re 17 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by THOMAS HOMAN, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JODY M. PRESCOTT, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (Williams, Mario) Modified text and links on 12/11/2018 (tth). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2018
  • Case Reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. Judge Emmet G. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-02115-JEB. (Shoreman, John) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dallas S. LePierre, :Firm- Nexus Derechos Humanos Attorneys, Inc., :Address- 44 Broad Street NW, Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-254-0442. Fax No. - 703-935-2453 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5780449. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC., STATEWIDE BONDING, INC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dallas S. LePierre)(Shoreman, John) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mario B. Williams, :Firm- Nexus Derechos Humanos Attorneys, Inc., :Address- 44 Broad Street NW, Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - 404-254-0442. Fax No. - 703-935-2453 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5780427. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC., STATEWIDE BONDING, INC (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mario Williams)(Shoreman, John) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Declaratory Judgment PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DECLARATORY AND MANDAMUS RELIEF by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC., STATEWIDE BONDING, INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Bond Management Handbook, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shoreman, John). Added MOTION for Mandamus Relief on 11/13/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, NEXUS SERVICES, INC., STATEWIDE BONDING, INC (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 - Prescott Email, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 - Letter to Prescott, #4 Exhibit Ex 3 - Letter to Shoreman)(Shoreman, John) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 15-2115. (zsb) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND MANDAMUS RELIEF against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5766359) filed by NEXUS SERVICES, INC., BIG MARCO INSURANCE AND BONDING SERVICES, LLC, MIKE DONOVAN, STATEWIDE BONDING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Related Case Form, #3 Summons Proposed Summons)(Shoreman, John) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where Statewide Bonding, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nexus Services, Inc. is a litigant