This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2020 at 16:08:08 (UTC).

State of Washington et al v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 State of Washington filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana M. Sabraw and Mitchell D. Dembin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01979

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana M. Sabraw

Referral Judge

Mitchell D. Dembin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State of North Carolina

State of Minnesota

State of Maryland

State of Washington

State of New Mexico

State of Vermont

State of Oregon

Commonwealth of Virginia

State of Illinois

Commonwealth of Pennsylvania

Commonwealth of Massachusetts

State of Iowa

Defendants

U.S. Department of Health and Human Services

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

United States of America

U.S. Customs and Border Protection

Donald Trump

Scott Lloyd

Kirstjen Nielsen

Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Megan Dy Lin

Attorney at Washington State Attorney General's Office

1125 Washington Street Se

Olympia, WA 98501

Sarah M Reyneveld

Attorney General'S Office (Sea- Fifth Ave), 800 5Th Ave, Ste 2000

Seattle, WA 98104-3188

Adam D. Snyder

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MARYLAND

200 Saint Paul Place, 20Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

Julia Doyle Bernhardt

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MARYLAND

200 Saint Paul Place, 20Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

Tania Maestas

Attorney at NM OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Po Drawer 1508

Santa Fe, NM 87504

Michelle S. Kallen

Attorney at Virginia Office of the Attorney General

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Matthew J. Martin

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Angela R Brooks

Attorney at MASSACHUSETTS ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

One Ashburton Place

Boston, MA 02108

Genevieve Nadeau

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE MASSACHUSETTS ATTORNEY GENERAL

One Ashburton Place

Boston, MA 02108

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah B. Fabian

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P. O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Joshua S. Press

Attorney at US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (BOX 868)

Po Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Nicole N. Murley

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

August Flentje

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

901 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw, Room 3613

Washington, DC 20530

Other Attorneys

Robyn R Bender

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

441 4Th Street Nw, Ste 630 South

Washington, DC 20001

Jasleen Kaur Singh

Attorney at California Department of Justice

300 South Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1230

Rachel Wainer Apter

Attorney at NJ OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

25 Market Street, Po Box 080

Trenton, NJ 08625

Vilma R Palma-Solana

Attorney at CALIFORNIA DEPT OF JUSTICE

300 S Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Vilma Palma-Solana

Attorney at California Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90011

Valerie M. Nannery

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

441 4Th Street Nw Ste 630 South, Public Advocacy Division

Washington, DC 20001

Sarah Elizabeth Belton

Attorney at California Department of Justice

1515 Clay Street, Suite 2000

Oakland, CA 94612

38 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#146

(#146) ORDER Granting #128 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Genevieve C. Nadeau's motion to withdraw as counsel for the Commonwealth of Massachusetts is granted. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/26/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#138

(#138) ORDER Granting #130 Defendants' Motion to Hold Proceedings in Abeyance. The Court grants Defendants' motion to hold this case in abeyance pending the proceedings in Ms. L.. The Court invites Plaintiffs to move for or otherwise coordinate the reopening of this case in conjunction with the substantial completion of the parties' identification of the newly added class members in Ms. L.. In the meantime, counsel for Plaintiffs in this case are welcome to participate in the continued status conferences in Ms. L., and should inform the Court if they wish to do so. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/20/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

128 #1

Declaration

#128

(#146) ORDER Granting #128 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Genevieve C. Nadeau's motion to withdraw as counsel for the Commonwealth of Massachusetts is granted. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/26/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

4 #13

Summons

4 #12

Summons

4 #11

Summons

4 #10

Summons

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States of America, Alex M. Azar, II, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(ST) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2018: #13 Summons) (ST). Modified on 6/26/2018 to indicate summons issued to defendant United States of America (KB). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

#3

(#3) EXHIBIT Summons re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington (Clinton, Laura) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:18-cv-00928, by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of California, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, The District of Columbia. (Clinton, Laura) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

1 #14

Summons

1 #13

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibits 111-131

203 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#146) ORDER Granting #128 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Genevieve C. Nadeau's motion to withdraw as counsel for the Commonwealth of Massachusetts is granted. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/26/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order by Judge Dana M. Sabraw: In light of Order #138 , the following motion is moot: #137 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Donald Trump, Thomas Homan, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Alex Azar, Office of Refugee Resettlement, United States of America, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kirstjen Nielsen, Kevin K. McAleenan, Scott Lloyd. (no document attached) (jak) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#145) ORDER Granting #144 Motion for Substitution of Attorney. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/18/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#144) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by State of Washington. (Clinton, Laura) (aef). (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#143) ORDER Granting #142 Motion for Substitution of Attorney. The Court grants the motion to designate TERA M. HEINTZ as local counsel for other attorneys for Plaintiff the State of Washington and as local counsel for attorneys for Plaintiffs Illinois and New Jersey in the above-captioned case, in substitution for MEGAN D. LIN. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/10/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#142) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by State of Washington. (Clinton, Laura) (aef). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#141) NOTICE of Appearance by Tera Marie Heintz on behalf of State of Washington (Heintz, Tera)Attorney Tera Marie Heintz added to party State of Washington(pty:pla) (aef). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#140) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by State of Washington re #139 Notice (Other) filed by State of Washington . (Lin, Megan) (aef). (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#139) ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #140 *** - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by State of Washington (Lin, Megan) Modified on 5/23/2019 to withdraw document (aef). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#138) ORDER Granting #130 Defendants' Motion to Hold Proceedings in Abeyance. The Court grants Defendants' motion to hold this case in abeyance pending the proceedings in Ms. L.. The Court invites Plaintiffs to move for or otherwise coordinate the reopening of this case in conjunction with the substantial completion of the parties' identification of the newly added class members in Ms. L.. In the meantime, counsel for Plaintiffs in this case are welcome to participate in the continued status conferences in Ms. L., and should inform the Court if they wish to do so. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/20/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
131 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Noah Guzzo Purcell on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Purcell, Noah) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Laura K Clinton on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Clinton, Laura) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Colleen M Melody on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Melody, Colleen) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (ST) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (Ad Hoc, Megan Lin) (ST) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States of America, Alex M. Azar, II, Thomas Homan, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Donald Trump, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(ST) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2018: #13 Summons) (ST). Modified on 6/26/2018 to indicate summons issued to defendant United States of America (KB). [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) EXHIBIT Summons re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington (Clinton, Laura) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Judge Richard A. Jones added. (ST) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:18-cv-00928, by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of California, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington, The District of Columbia. (Clinton, Laura) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5372043) Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party Commonwealth of Massachusetts(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party Commonwealth of Pennsylvania(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party Commonwealth of Virginia(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of California(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Delaware(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Illinois(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Iowa (pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Maryland(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Minnesota (pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of New Jersey(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of New Mexico(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of New York(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of North Carolina(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Rhode Island (pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Vermont(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), Attorney Laura K Clinton added to party The District of Columbia(pty:pla), filed by State of Minnesota, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Delaware, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Washington, The District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of New Mexico, State of California, State of Iowa, State of Rhode Island, State of New York, State of Vermont, State of New Jersey, State of Maryland, State of Illinois, State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-40, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 41-80, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 81-100, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 101-110, #5 Exhibit Exhibits 111-131, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons)(Clinton, Laura) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/27/2018.] (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.