Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2018 at 07:16:45 (UTC).

State of Washington et al v. United States Department of State et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2018 State of Washington filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States Department of State. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert S. Lasnik. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01115

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert S. Lasnik

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

District of Columbia

State of Maryland

Commonwealth of Massachusetts

State of Washington

Commonwealth of Pennsylvania

State of New York

State of Connecticut

State of New Jersey

State of Oregon

State of North Carolina

State of Minnesota

Defendants

Directorate of Defense Trade Controls

United States Department of State

Sarah Heidema

Second Amendment Foundation, Inc

Michael R. Pompeo

Conn Williamson

Defense Distributed

Mike Miller

Amicus Curiae

Everytown for Gun Safety

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey George Rupert

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (40110-OLY)

Po Box 40110

Olympia, WA 98504

Jimmy R Rock

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

441 4Th Street Nw, Ste 630 South

Washington, DC 20001

Robyn R Bender

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

441 4Th Street Nw, Ste 630 South

Washington, DC 20001

Andrew J Saindon

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

441 4Th Street Nw, Suite 630 South

Washington, DC 20001

Todd Richard Bowers

Attorney General'S Office (Sea- Fifth Ave), 800 5Th Ave, Ste 2000

Seattle, WA 98104-3188

Jeffrey Todd Sprung

Attorney General'S Office (Sea- Fifth Ave), 800 5Th Ave, Ste 2000

Seattle, WA 98104-3188

Kristin Beneski

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

800 Fifth Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98104-3188

Zachary P Jones

Attorney General'S Office (Sea- Fifth Ave), 800 5Th Ave, Ste 2000

Seattle, WA 98104-3188

Jonathan Scott Goldman

Attorney at EXECUTIVE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, CIVIL DIVISION

Strawberry Square, 15Th Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17120

Jacob Campion

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MINNESOTA

445 Minnesota Street, Suite 1100

St Paul, MN 55101

Defendant Attorneys

Joel B. Ard

Attorney at IMMIX LAW GROUP PC

701 5Th Avenue, Suite 4710

Seattle, WA 98104

Josh Blackman

Attorney at JOSH BLACKMAN LLC

1303 San Jacinto Street

Houston, TX 77063

Matthew Goldstein

Attorney at FARHANG & MEDCOFF

4801 East Broadway Blvd, Ste 311

Tucson, AZ 85711

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Deepak Gupta

Attorney at GUPTA WESSLER PLLC

1900 L Street, Nw, Ste 312

Washington, DC 20036

Other Attorneys

Nelson R Richards

Attorney at CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

2550 Mariposa Mall, Room 5090

Fresno, CA 93721

Robert T Nakatsuji

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

425 Queen Street

Honolulu, HI 96813

John D Kimball

Attorney at BLANK ROME (NY)

405 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10174

Susan E. Urso

Attorney at RHODE ISLAND DEPARTMENT OF ATTORNEY GENERAL

150 South Main

Providence, RI 02903

Andrew P Richards

Attorney at GARVEY SCHUBERT BARER (WA)

1191 Second Ave, 18Th Fl

Seattle, WA 98101-2939

Kit Walsh

Attorney at ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION

815 Eddy Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

30 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#105

(#105) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR FEDERAL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINITFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FILE AN ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by parties (Robinson, Stuart) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#104

(#104) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Daniel Hammond for Defendant Defense Distributed. (Flores, Charles) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#103

(#103) ORDER denying Interested Party Benjamin Barber's #99 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Benjamin Barber terminated.) (cc: Benjamin Barber via USPS) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#102

(#102) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 10/5/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#100

(#100) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Susan Urso FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Rhode Island (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5459749 (Rupert, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

99 #1

Amicus Curiae Brief

#99

(#99) MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Interested Party Benjamin Barber. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Curiae Brief) Noted by Clerk for 9/14/2018, (SWT) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

43 #3

Proposed Order

43 #2

Appendix

1 #10

Summons Conn Williamson

1 #9

Summons Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.

1 #7

Summons Sarah Heidema

1 #6

Summons Mike Miller

1 #5

Summons Directorate of Defense Trade Controls

1 #4

Summons Michael Pompeo

1 #3

Summons US Department of State

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1-8

144 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#105) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR FEDERAL DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINITFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FILE AN ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by parties (Robinson, Stuart) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Daniel Hammond for Defendant Defense Distributed. (Flores, Charles) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) ORDER denying Interested Party Benjamin Barber's #99 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Benjamin Barber terminated.) (cc: Benjamin Barber via USPS) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 10/5/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) ORDER re #100 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Susan E. Urso for Plaintiff State of Rhode Island, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Susan Urso FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Rhode Island (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5459749 (Rupert, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, filed by Interested Party Benjamin Barber. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Curiae Brief) Noted by Clerk for 9/14/2018, (SWT) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) MEMORANDUM filed by Amicus The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence re #43 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and as granted by Court Order #95 (Kimball, John) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) ORDER re #96 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Maura Murphy Osborne for Plaintiff State of Connecticut, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Maura Murphy Osborne FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff State of Connecticut (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5452020 (Rupert, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (cc: Kristin Beneski; Todd Bowers; Jeff Sprung) (ST) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LETTER from Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, and Conn Williamson regarding Motion for TRO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Ard, Joel) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All defendant(s) (Main document - Summons United States Department of State) (Attachments: #1 Summons Michael Pompeo, #2 Summons Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, #3 Summons Mike Miller, #4 Summons Sarah Heidema, #5 Summons Defense Distributed, #6 Summons Second Amendment Foundation, #7 Summons Conn Williamson)(CDA) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Josh Blackman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc, Conn Williamson (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5415308 (Ard, Joel) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joel B. Ard on behalf of Defendants Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc, Conn Williamson. (Ard, Joel) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SG) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Todd Bowers re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Rupert, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Jeffrey Sprung re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff State of Washington (Rupert, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/30/2018, (Rupert, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5414989), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons US Department of State, #4 Summons Michael Pompeo, #5 Summons Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, #6 Summons Mike Miller, #7 Summons Sarah Heidema, #8 Summons Defense Distributed, #9 Summons Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., #10 Summons Conn Williamson)(Rupert, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Directorate of Defense Trade Controls is a litigant

Latest cases where Defense Distributed is a litigant

Latest cases where Everytown for Gun Safety is a litigant

Latest cases where Second Amendment Foundation is a litigant