This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2018 at 05:44:44 (UTC).

State of Utah v. Environmental Restoration, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 State of Utah filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Environmental Restoration, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judge overseeing this case is William P. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00319

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Utah

Defendants

Environmental Restoration, LLC

Gold King Mines Corporation

Environmental Protection Agency

Scott Pruitt

Kinross Gold Corporation

Weston Solutions, Inc.

Kinross Gold USA, Inc

Sunnyside Gold Corporation

United States of America

Harrison Western Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew L. Hofer

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

Peter Hsiao

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 6000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3543

Spencer E. Austin

Attorney at Utah Attorney General's Office

5272 S College Dr, Suite 200

Murray, UT 84123

Defendant Attorneys

Andriy Pazuniak

Attorney at Glaser, Weil, Fink, Howard LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd., 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

E. Blaine Rawson

Attorney at Ray Quinney & Nebeker

36 S State Street, Suite 1400, Po Box 45385

Salt Lake City, UT 84145-0385

John A Adams

Attorney at Ray, Quinney & Nebeker

Po Box 45385

Salt Lake City, UT 84145

Peter Sheridan

Attorney at Christensen,Weil, Fink, Howard LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd., 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Terry D Avchen

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd., 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Alan D Greenberg

Attorney at US Department of Justice

999 18Th Street, #945

Denver, CO 80202

Bradford C. Berge

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

Post Office Box 2208, 110 N. Guadalupe St., Suite 1

Santa Fe, NM 87504-2208

Craig D. Galli

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

222 South Main, Sutie 2200

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Jill H. Van Noord

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

555 Seventeenth Street, Suite 3200

Denver, CO 80202

Steven G. Jones

Attorney at Holland & Hart LLP

222 S Main Street, Suite 2200

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Blake A. Klinkner

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP

237 Storey Blvd, Suite 110

Cheyenne, WY 82009

Christopher C. Stoneback

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP

Post Office Box 2529

Billings, MT 59103-2529

Jeffery J Oven

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP

Po Box 2529

Billings, MT 59103-2529

Neil G Westesen

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP

P.O. Box 10969

Bozeman, MT 59715

Pamela C. Garman

Attorney at Crowley Fleck PLLP

490 N 31St Street, Suite 500, Po Box 2529

Billings, MT 59103-2529

Brian Molzahn

Attorney at Hall & Evans, LLC

1001 Seventeenth Street, Suite 300

Denver, CO 80203

Ryan P. Atkinson

Attorney at Strong & Hanni

102 S 200 E, Suite 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#116

#115

#114

#113

#112

#111

110 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#110

#107

5 #3

Exhibit C - Hofer Proposed Order

5 #2

Exhibit B - Hofer Filing Reg

5 #1

Exhibit A - Hofer Application

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Exhibit Additional Defendants

#2

#1

231 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#116) CLERKS ORDER of Conditional Transfer re Gold King Mine Release In San Juan County, Colorado, On August 5, 2015 MDL 2824 signed by Sarah Vance, Chair, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (rks) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#115) MEMORANDUM DECISION denying #110 Motion to Lift Stay of Proceedings for the Limited Purpose of Conducting a Settlement Conference with Federal Defenders. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/27/18. (jlw) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#114) REPLY to Response to Motion re #110 MOTION Limited relief from stay for settlement conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff State of Utah, The. (Hsiao, Peter) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#113) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #110 MOTION Limited relief from stay for settlement conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Environmental Protection Agency, Scott Pruitt, United States of America. (Greenberg, Alan) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#112) NOTICE of Appearance by Alan David Greenberg on behalf of Environmental Protection Agency, Scott Pruitt, United States of America (Greenberg, Alan) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#111) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Peter Hsiao in Support re #110 MOTION Limited relief from stay for settlement conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff State of Utah, The. (Hsiao, Peter) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 03/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#110) MOTION Limited relief from stay for settlement conference and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff State of Utah, The. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hsiao, Peter) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 03/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#109) NOTICE OF FILING re #107 Notice (Other) Designation of Non-Parties at Fault (C.R.S. 13-21-111.5) filed by Defendant Harrison Western Corporation. (Molzahn, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#108) ORDER re #106 Substitution of Counsel filed by Sunnyside Gold Corporation. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 1/25/18. (jlw) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#107) NOTICE of Designation of Non-Parties at Fault by Environmental Restoration (Pazuniak, Andriy) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Environmental Restoration. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kinross Gold USA. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter Hsiao for State of Utah, The. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 8/2/2017. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew L. Hofer for State of Utah, The. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 8/2/2017. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter Hsiao , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2810543, filed by Plaintiff State of Utah, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hsiao Application, #2 Exhibit B - Hsiao Filing Reg, #3 Exhibit C - Hsiao Proposed Order)(Austin, Spencer) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 08/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew L. Hofer , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2810510, filed by Plaintiff State of Utah, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hofer Application, #2 Exhibit B - Hofer Filing Reg, #3 Exhibit C - Hofer Proposed Order)(Austin, Spencer) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 08/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Peter Hsiao, Matthew L. Hofer, for Plaintiff State of Utah, The (tlh) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 08/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) EXHIBITS filed by State of Utah, The re #2 Complaint,. (Austin, Spencer) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Environmental Restoration, Gold King Mines, Harrison Western Corporation, Kinross Gold Corporation, Kinross Gold USA, Sunnyside Gold Corporation (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2809766) filed by State of Utah, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Additional Defendants) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Austin, Spencer) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiff State of Utah, The is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) [Transferred from Utah on 4/5/2018.] (Entered: 07/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gold King Mines Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Weston Solutions Inc. is a litigant