This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/18/2022 at 09:32:06 (UTC).

State of Rhode Island v. Shell Oil Products Company, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 State of Rhode Island filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Shell Oil Products Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William E. Smith and Lincoln D. Almond. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00395

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Rhode Island

Providence, RI 02903

Defendants

Phillips 66

Hess Corp.

Chevron Corp.

Chevron USA, Inc.

Motiva Enterprises, LLC

Marathon Oil Corporation

ConocoPhillips Company

Marathon Petroleum Company, LP

Conocophillips

Lukoil Pan Americas LLC

Shell Oil Products Company, LLC

BP America, Inc.

Speedway, LLC

Marathon Oil Company

BP Products North America, Inc.

Exxonmobil Corp.

Citgo Petroleum Corp.

Marathon Petroleum Corp.

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rebecca Tedford Partington

Attorney at DeSisto Law, LLC

60 Ship Street

Providence, RI 02903

Peter F. Kilmartin

Attorney at Department of the Attorney General

150 South Main Street

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant Attorneys

Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Ryan M. Gainor

Attorney at Hinckley, Allen & Snyder LLP

100 Westminster Street, Suie 1500

Providence, RI 02903

Robin-Lee Main

Attorney at Hinckley Allen & Snyder

100 Westminster Street, Suite 1500

Providence, RI 02903-0819

David C. Frederick

Attorney at Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, PLLC

1615 M Street Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Douglas J. Emanuel

Attorney at Chace, Ruttenberg & Freedman, LLP

One Park Row, Suite 300

Providence, RI 02093

Elizabeth A. Kim

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Ann Marie Mortimer

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Shannon S. Broome

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

50 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Shawn Patrick Regan

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

200 Park Abenue

New York, NY 10166

Samuel A. Kennedy-Smith

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

1 Citizens Plaza, Floor 2

Providence, RI 02903

Patricia K. Rocha

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.

One Citizens Plaza, 8Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Matthew T. Heartney

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5844

Nancy G. Milburn

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019-9710

Jeffrey B. Pine

Attorney at Lynch & Pine, Attorneys at Law

One Park Row, Fifth Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Matthew Thomas Oliverio

Attorney at Oliverio & Marcaccio LLP

30 Romano Vineyard Way, Ste. 109

North Kingstown, RI 02852

Jaren Janghorbani

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

Nathan P. Eimer

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

224 S. Michigan Ave.

Chicago, IL 60604

Pamela R. Hanebutt

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

224 S. Michigan Ave.

Chicago, IL 60604

48 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#158

(#158) MANDATE of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit issued as to and in accordance with #157 Judgment of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#157

(#157) JUDGMENT of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit entered as to #125 Notice of Appeal. The district court's order remanding the case to Rhode Island state court is affirmed. Costs are awarded to the State of Rhode Island. [19-1818] (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#156

(#156) OPINION of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit entered as to #125 Notice of Appeal, filed by Marathon Petroleum Company, LP, Citgo Petroleum Corp., Marathon Oil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises, LLC, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC, Marathon Oil Company, Speedway, LLC, Phillips 66, ConocoPhillips Company, Royal Dutch Shell,PLC, BP, PLC, Conocophillips, BP Products North America, Inc., Hess Corp., Chevron USA, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Corp., Getty Petroleum Marketing, Inc., Exxonmobil Corp., Lukoil Pan Americas LLC, Chevron Corp. See 28 U.S.C. 46(d).[19-1818] (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#155

(#155) NOTICE by Motiva Enterprises, LLC of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jerome C. Roth, Esq. and Elizabeth A. Kim, Esq. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#154

(#154) NOTICE by Royal Dutch Shell,PLC, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jerome C. Roth, Esq. and Elizabeth A. Kim, Esq. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#153

(#153) NOTICE by Motiva Enterprises, LLC of Withdrawal of Appearance of David C. Frederick, Esq. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#152

(#152) NOTICE by Royal Dutch Shell,PLC, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC of Withdrawal of Appearance of Brendan J. Crimmins, Esq. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#151

(#151) NOTICE by Motiva Enterprises, LLC withdrawal of appearance, Douglas Emanuel and (Fine, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#125

(#156) OPINION of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit entered as to #125 Notice of Appeal, filed by Marathon Petroleum Company, LP, Citgo Petroleum Corp., Marathon Oil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises, LLC, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC, Marathon Oil Company, Speedway, LLC, Phillips 66, ConocoPhillips Company, Royal Dutch Shell,PLC, BP, PLC, Conocophillips, BP Products North America, Inc., Hess Corp., Chevron USA, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Corp., Getty Petroleum Marketing, Inc., Exxonmobil Corp., Lukoil Pan Americas LLC, Chevron Corp. See 28 U.S.C. 46(d).[19-1818] (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

4 #1

State Court Filing

#4

3 #4

Exhibit D-Navy Contract

3 #3

Exhibit C-Oil/Gas Lease

3 #2

Exhibit B-Lease

3 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Record

#3

#2

#1

212 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#158) MANDATE of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit issued as to and in accordance with #157 Judgment of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit. (Simoncelli, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#157) JUDGMENT of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit entered as to #125 Notice of Appeal. The district court's order remanding the case to Rhode Island state court is affirmed. Costs are awarded to the State of Rhode Island. [19-1818] (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#156) OPINION of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the First Circuit entered as to #125 Notice of Appeal, filed by Marathon Petroleum Company, LP, Citgo Petroleum Corp., Marathon Oil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises, LLC, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC, Marathon Oil Company, Speedway, LLC, Phillips 66, ConocoPhillips Company, Royal Dutch Shell,PLC, BP, PLC, Conocophillips, BP Products North America, Inc., Hess Corp., Chevron USA, Inc., Marathon Petroleum Corp., Getty Petroleum Marketing, Inc., Exxonmobil Corp., Lukoil Pan Americas LLC, Chevron Corp. See 28 U.S.C. 46(d).[19-1818] (Kenny, Meghan) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#155) NOTICE by Motiva Enterprises, LLC of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jerome C. Roth, Esq. and Elizabeth A. Kim, Esq. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) NOTICE by Royal Dutch Shell,PLC, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jerome C. Roth, Esq. and Elizabeth A. Kim, Esq. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#153) NOTICE by Motiva Enterprises, LLC of Withdrawal of Appearance of David C. Frederick, Esq. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) NOTICE by Royal Dutch Shell,PLC, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC of Withdrawal of Appearance of Brendan J. Crimmins, Esq. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) NOTICE by Motiva Enterprises, LLC withdrawal of appearance, Douglas Emanuel and (Fine, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phillips 66. (Baldwin, Timothy) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Dutch Shell,PLC, Shell Oil Products Company, LLC. (Brenner, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
197 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shell Oil Products Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Shell Oil Company, Other Affiliate Royal Dutch Shell plc for Shell Oil Products Company, LLC.. (Emanuel, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Shell Oil Products Company, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case that Notice of Removal was Filed in State Court (Attachments: #1 State Court Filing)(Emanuel, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case with State Court Record attached by Shell Oil Products Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B-Lease, #3 Exhibit C-Oil/Gas Lease, #4 Exhibit D-Navy Contract)(Emanuel, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Shell Oil Products Company, LLC. Regarding New Case: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case . (Emanuel, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-4716. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1236481, filed by Shell Oil Products Company, LLC.(Emanuel, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shell Oil Products Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Shell Oil Company, Other Affiliate Royal Dutch Shell plc for Shell Oil Products Company, LLC.. (Emanuel, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Shell Oil Products Company, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case that Notice of Removal was Filed in State Court (Attachments: #1 State Court Filing)(Emanuel, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case with State Court Record attached by Shell Oil Products Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B-Lease, #3 Exhibit C-Oil/Gas Lease, #4 Exhibit D-Navy Contract)(Emanuel, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Shell Oil Products Company, LLC. Regarding New Case: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case . (Emanuel, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-4716. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1236481, filed by Shell Oil Products Company, LLC.(Emanuel, Douglas) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less