This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2022 at 09:24:12 (UTC).

State Of New York et al v. Donald Trump et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2017 State Of New York filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Donald Trump. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Allyne R. Ross, Robert M. Levy, James Orenstein, Vera M. Scanlon and Nicholas G. Garaufis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-05228

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Allyne R. Ross

Nicholas G. Garaufis

Referral Judges

Robert M. Levy

James Orenstein

Vera M. Scanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State of North Carolina

State of Washington

State of New Mexico

State of Vermont

State of Oregon

State of Illinois

State of Iowa

State of Virginia

State of Massachussetts

District of Columbia

State of Pennsylvania

State of Rhode Island

State of Delaware

State of Connecticut

State Of New York

Defendants

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

United States of America

Donald Trump

U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

131 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sania Waheed Khan

Attorney at NYS Office of the Attorney General

120 Broadway

New York, NY 10271

Lourdes Maria Rosado

Attorney at New York Civil Liberties Union

1 Whitehall Street, Ste 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10004

Sarah Weston

Attorney at Oregon Department of Justice

100 Sw Market Street

Portland, OR 97201

Kathleen Marie Konopka

Attorney at DC Office of the Attorney General

400 6Th Street, N.W., Ste 10Th Floor

Washington, DC 20001

Rebecca Partington

Attorney at Rhode Island Attorney General

150 South Main Street

Providence, RI 02903

Aleine M. Cohen

Attorney at Delaware Department of Justice

820 North French Street, 6Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Diane Omotayo Lucas

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorney

Stephen M. Pezzi

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

20 Massachusetts Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Other Attorneys

Donna H. Kalama

Attorney at Department of the Attorney General

425 Queen Street

Honolulu, HI 96813

Steven E. Obus

Attorney at Proskauer Rose, LLP

11 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

J. Wells Harrell

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

1401 New York Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Robert T. Nakatsuji

Attorney at Department of the Attorney General

425 Queen Street

Honolulu, HI 96813

Fernando A. Bohorquez, Jr.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Jacqueline C. Melmed

Attorney at Office of the Governor of Colorado

200 E Colfax Ave, Room 121

Denver, CO 80203

Sirine Shebaya

Attorney at National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers' G

2201 Wisconsin Ave Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20007

Rory Schneider

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Shiloh Rainwater

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

Eleven Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Michael Anthony Guerra

Attorney at Venable LLP

1290 Avenue Of The Americas, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10104

Melissa DiGrande

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Kaitland McCann Kennelly

Attorney at Cooley LLP

55 Hudson Yards

New York, NY 10001

102 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#348

(#348) Notice of MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Aimee D. Thomson by State of Pennsylvania. (Thomson, Aimee) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#347

(#347) NOTICE by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington regarding submission filed in Batalla Vidal v. Mayorkas, No. 16-cv-4756. (Irving, Louisa) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#346

(#346) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by State Of New York. (Dasgupta, Anisha) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#345

(#345) NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Zhou on behalf of State Of New York (aty to be noticed) (Zhou, Grace) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#344

(#344) ORDER re #343 Proposed Scheduling Order - The parties have conferred and propose that the New York plaintiffs file a submission regarding the Batalla Vidal plaintiffs' forthcoming motion by May 20, 2022. Application granted. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/11/2022. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#343

(#343) Proposed Scheduling Order for New York plaintiffs' submission regarding the Batalla Vidal plaintiffs' forthcoming motion by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington (Murdukhayeva, Ester) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

#342

(#342) NOTICE of Appearance by Ester Murdukhayeva on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Murdukhayeva, Ester) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#341

(#341) NOTICE of Appearance by Louisa Irving on behalf of State Of New York (aty to be noticed) (Irving, Louisa) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

1 #9

Proposed Summons USA (DOJ)

1 #8

Proposed Summons USCIS NYC

1 #7

Proposed Summons USCIS HQ

1 #6

Proposed Summons ICE

1 #5

Proposed Summons Donald Trump

1 #4

Proposed Summons DHS HQ

1 #3

Proposed Summons Elaine C. Duke

1 #2

Appendix

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

851 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #348 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Aimee D. Thomson terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/8/2022. (Lozar, Ryan) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#348) Notice of MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Aimee D. Thomson by State of Pennsylvania. (Thomson, Aimee) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#347) NOTICE by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington regarding submission filed in Batalla Vidal v. Mayorkas, No. 16-cv-4756. (Irving, Louisa) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #346 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Anisha S Dasgupta terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/25/2022. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#346) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by State Of New York. (Dasgupta, Anisha) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#345) NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Zhou on behalf of State Of New York (aty to be noticed) (Zhou, Grace) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#344) ORDER re #343 Proposed Scheduling Order - The parties have conferred and propose that the New York plaintiffs file a submission regarding the Batalla Vidal plaintiffs' forthcoming motion by May 20, 2022. Application granted. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/11/2022. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#343) Proposed Scheduling Order for New York plaintiffs' submission regarding the Batalla Vidal plaintiffs' forthcoming motion by District of Columbia, State Of New York, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington (Murdukhayeva, Ester) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#342) NOTICE of Appearance by Ester Murdukhayeva on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Murdukhayeva, Ester) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#341) NOTICE of Appearance by Louisa Irving on behalf of State Of New York (aty to be noticed) (Irving, Louisa) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
448 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein for all further proceedings. Judge Allyne R. Ross, Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 9/7/2017. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Reassign Case requesting reassignment to the Honorable Nicholas G. Garaufis, because it is related to Batalla Vidal et al. v. Baran et al., No. 1:16-cv-4756 by State Of New York, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Massachussetts, State of New Mexico, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert Ferguson Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9810331. by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing -WA) (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Colleen Melody Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9810258. by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - WA) (Melody, Colleen) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan B. Miller on behalf of State of Massachussetts (aty to be noticed) (Miller, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT State of New York, et al. against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9807840 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by State of North Carolina, State of Hawaii, State of Massachussetts, State Of New York, State of Virginia, State of Pennsylvania, District of Columbia, State of Washington, State of Iowa, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Illinois, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, State of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Proposed Summons Elaine C. Duke, #4 Proposed Summons DHS HQ, #5 Proposed Summons Donald Trump, #6 Proposed Summons ICE, #7 Proposed Summons USCIS HQ, #8 Proposed Summons USCIS NYC, #9 Proposed Summons USA (DOJ)) (Rosado, Lourdes) (Entered: 09/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where US Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant