This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2021 at 06:02:29 (UTC).

State of Maryland v. Exxon Mobil Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 State of Maryland filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Exxon Mobil Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marvin J. Garbis and Stephanie A. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00459

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Marvin J. Garbis

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Maryland

Defendants

Cumberland Farms, Inc.

Shell Oil Products Company LLC

Chevron Corporation

Sun Company, Inc.

PJSC Lukoil

CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P.

Getty Petroleum Marketing Inc.

The Premcor Refining Group Inc.

BP Amoco Chemical Company

Texaco Inc.

BP America Inc.

Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC

Western Refining Yorktown, Inc.

NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P.

El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company

Sheetz, Inc.

Lukoil Americas Corporation

Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P.

Vitol S.A.

48 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephanie D Cobb Williams

Attorney at State of Maryland Office of the Attorney General

1800 Washington Blvd Ste 6048

Baltimore, MD 21230

Adam Dean Snyder

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

200 St. Paul Place, 20Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

Brian E Frosh

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

200 St. Paul Place

Baltimore, MD 21202

Matthew Spencer Zimmerman

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of MD

1800 Washington Blvd Ste 6048

Baltimore, MD 21230

Defendant Attorneys

Ashley Moore Drake

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

1900 N St. Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Mark E Tully

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

100 Northern Ave.

Boston, MA 02210

Alexander Peter Creticos

Attorney at Miles and Stockbridge PC

100 Light St

Baltimore, MD 21202

Ezra Gollogly

Attorney at Kramon and Graham PA

One South St Ste 2600

Baltimore, MD 21202

Erika M Anderson

Attorney at Dowd Bennett LLP

7733 Forsyth Blvd. Ste. 1900

St. Louis, MO 63105

William W Carrier, III

Attorney at Tydings and Rosenberg LLP

1 E Pratt St 9Th Fl

Baltimore, MD 21202

John Bucher Isbister

Attorney at Tydings and Rosenberg LLP

One East Pratt Street, Suite 901

Baltimore, MD 21202

Andrew R. Running

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

J Andrew Langan

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

300 N Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Dawn Allison Ellison

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

2101 L Street, Nw, Suite1000

Washington, DC 20037

Other Attorneys

Judy B Harvey

Attorney at U.S. Department Of Justice

Po Box 7415

Washington, DC 20044

Peter R Knight

Attorney at Robinson and Cole LLP

280 Trumbull St.

Hartford, CT 06103

Stephen Riccardulli

Attorney at Buchanan Ingersoll and Rooney PC

1290 Avenue Of The Americas 30Th Fl.

New York, NY 10104

Michael Andrew Walsh

Attorney at Parsons McEntire McCleary PLLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 4400

Dallas, TX 75201

Katherine Carol Ondeck

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Michelle Ciszak Pardo

Attorney at Fulbright and Jaworski LLP

505 9Th Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-2166

96 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#653

(#653) ORDER granting #642 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to "Closed Sites". Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/3/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#652

(#652) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/3/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

642 #7

Text of Proposed Order

642 #6

Exhibit D

642 #5

Exhibit C

642 #4

Exhibit B

642 #3

Exhibit A

642 #1

Memorandum in Support

#642

#7

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Case Information Report

#2

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

863 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#653) ORDER granting #642 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to "Closed Sites". Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/3/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#652) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/3/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#651) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #648 MOTION NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE AND MOTION TO CHANGE DEFENDANT NAME. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/2/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#650) NOTICE by State of Maryland of Supplemental Information (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher H. Ralston)(Kauff, Scott) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#649) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 10/18/2021, before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Court Reporter Patricia G. Mitchell, 410-962-3858, trish_mitchell@mdd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2022.(pm, Court Reporter) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketTelephonic Motions Hearing held on 10/18/2021 before Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#648) MOTION NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE AND MOTION TO CHANGE DEFENDANT NAME by TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Einik, Daniella) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#647) ORDER re: Rescheduling telephonic Motions Hearing. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/8/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#646) ORDER re: CANCELLATION of Telephonic Status Conference. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/27/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#645) REPLY to Response to Motion re #642 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to "Closed Sites" filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, Mobile Corporation.(Pardo, James) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
639 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's Rule 103.5 (a) Cettification by Atlantic Richfield Company (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-8) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY MARYLAND. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Atlantic Richfield Company (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued 30 days as to Atlantic Richfield Company.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against 7-Eleven, Inc., Apex Oil Company, Inc., Astra Oil Company, LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, BP America Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Corporation North America Inc., BP Products North America Inc., CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, Cumberland Farms, Inc., Duke Energy Merchants, LLC, ETP Holdco Corporation, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Energy Transfer Partners, L.P., Equilon Enterprises LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobile Oil Corporation, George E. Warren Corporation, Getty Petroleum Marketing Inc., Getty Properties Corp., Gulf Oil Limited Partnership, Guttman Energy, Inc., Hartree Partners, LP, Hess Corporation, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corporation, Holtzman Oil Corporation, Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Operating L.P. A, Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC, Lukoil Americas Corporation, Lukoil North America LLC, Lukoil Pan America, LLC, Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Mobile Corporation, Motiva Enterprises LLC, NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P., PJSC Lukoil, Phillips 66 Company, Premcor USA Inc., Sheetz, Inc., Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Trading (US) Company, Sun Company, Inc., Sunoco Partners Marketing & Terminals L.P., Sunoco, Inc., Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), TMR Company, TOTAL Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., TRMI-H LLC, Texaco Inc., The Premcor Refining Group Inc., Transmontaigne Product Services, LLC, Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining and Marketing Company, Vitol S.A., Wawa, Inc., Western Refining Yorktown, Inc., filed by State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City Maryland, case number 24-C-17-6343. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637104038), filed by Atlantic Richfield Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2018: #2 Exhibit 2) (kw2s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company is a litigant

Latest cases where NuStar Terminals Operations Partnership L.P. is a litigant