This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:27 (UTC).

Starrish v. Wofford

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Starrish filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Wofford. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James P. Donohue and John C Coughenour. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01257

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James P. Donohue

Presiding Judge

John C Coughenour

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Doreen Starrish

Gig Harbor, WA 98332-8300

Respondent

Deborah J Wofford

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Prison Trust Account

#11

(#11) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Petitioner Doreen Starrish. (*NOTE TO FILER*: Motion is moot as filing fee was paid on 10/12/18) (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Extend Due Date for Filing Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner Doreen Starrish. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

9 #1

Exhibit

9 #2

Exhibit

#9

(#9) 2254 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by Doreen Starrish. (Receipt # SEA092839) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)**33 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

8 #1

IFP Application

#8

(#8) LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - ****PAGE 2 - MUST HAVE SIGNATURE OF FINANCIAL OFFICER**** Filer has until 10/29/2018 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

7 #4

Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus

7 #3

Exhibit

7 #5

Proposed Motion to Extend Due Date for Filing Habeas Corpus

7 #2

Exhibits

7 #1

Prison Trust Account Statement

#7

(#7) APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Doreen Starrish (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account Statement, #2 Exhibits, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #5 Proposed Motion to Extend Due Date for Filing Habeas Corpus)**38 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#6

(#6) LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months.- Signature is missing from the document(s). Please sign as appropriate.- ****Certification by Officer is required for both the IFP Application and the Prisoner Trust Account Statement. Attached is the IFP Application for Officer signature. Filer has until 10/25/2018 to correct (Attachments: #1 Incomplete IFP Application) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

6 #1

Incomplete IFP Application

#5

(#5) EXHIBIT re #1 Proposed Document(s), by Petitioner Doreen Starrish (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)**75 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

5 #1

Exhibit 2

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Petitioner Doreen Starrish. (*NOTE TO FILER*: Motion is moot as filing fee was paid on 10/12/18) (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Extend Due Date for Filing Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner Doreen Starrish. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 2254 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by Doreen Starrish. (Receipt # SEA092839) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)**33 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • FILING FEE RECEIVED: Rec# SEA092839; $5.00 **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated re #8 Letter re Deficiency. Filing fee paid. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - ****PAGE 2 - MUST HAVE SIGNATURE OF FINANCIAL OFFICER**** Filer has until 10/29/2018 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Doreen Starrish (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account Statement, #2 Exhibits, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #5 Proposed Motion to Extend Due Date for Filing Habeas Corpus)**38 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • IFP deficiency corrected IN PART (Prison trust account statement with attachments filed - to be filed separately) **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months.- Signature is missing from the document(s). Please sign as appropriate.- ****Certification by Officer is required for both the IFP Application and the Prisoner Trust Account Statement. Attached is the IFP Application for Officer signature. Filer has until 10/25/2018 to correct (Attachments: #1 Incomplete IFP Application) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXHIBIT re #1 Proposed Document(s), by Petitioner Doreen Starrish (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)**75 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) IFP deficiency INCOMPLETE re #2 IFP Deficiency Letter, (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account Statement (not certified))**5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED ARE NOT COMPLETE - MISSING SIGNATURES-CERTIFICATION FOR IFP AND PRISON TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT MISSING. NEW IFP DEFICIENCY LETTER TO FOLLOW(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Proposed Document(s). Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 9/27/2018 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Doreen Starrish. (NO FILING FEE/NO IFP) (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Motion to Extend Due Date for Filing Habeas Corpus) **27 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST) Modified on 8/31/2018 to add print instructions (KB). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.