This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2018 at 07:41:47 (UTC).

Stafford et al v. Tedder

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 Stafford filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Tedder. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00149

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Teresa Lynne Stafford

Donald Stafford

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Jacob Tedder

Progressive Mountain Insurance Company

USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Progressive Mountain Insurance Company

USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Charles Johnson

Attorney at Nimmons & Malchow, PC

P.O. Box 460

Augusta, GA 30903

Leland M. Malchow

Attorney at Nimmons & Malchow, PC

P.O. Box 460

Augusta, GA 30903

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Beverly G. O'Hearn

Attorney at Lueder, Larkin & Hunter, LLC

7 East Congress Street, Suite 712

Savannah, GA 31401

Neil Staten Bitting, Jr.

Attorney at Fulcher Hagler, LLP

P.O. Box 1477

Augusta, GA 30903-1477

Ellen Louise Ash

Attorney at Fain, Major & Brennan, P.C.

100 Glenridge Point Parkway, Suite 500

Atlanta, GA 30342

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Neil Staten Bitting, Jr.

Attorney at Fulcher Hagler, LLP

P.O. Box 1477

Augusta, GA 30903-1477

Ellen Louise Ash

Attorney at Fain, Major & Brennan, P.C.

100 Glenridge Point Parkway, Suite 500

Atlanta, GA 30342

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Crossclaim of USAA by Jacob Tedder.(O'Hearn, Beverly) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Crossclaim of Progressive by Jacob Tedder.(O'Hearn, Beverly) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#15

(#15) Litigants' Bill of Rights by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Ash, Ellen) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#13

(#13) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Ash, Ellen) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#12

(#12) USAA Casualty Insurance Company ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Jacob Tedder by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Ash, Ellen) Modified on 10/5/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#11

(#11) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Jacob Tedder. (O'Hearn, Beverly) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Jacob Tedder. (O'Hearn, Beverly) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Jacob Tedder.(O'Hearn, Beverly) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. (Bitting, Neil) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

6 #1

Signature Page

#6

(#6) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. (Bitting, Neil) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: #1 Signature Page) (jlh). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint of Progressive, CROSSCLAIM against Jacob Tedder by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company.(Bitting, Neil) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Donald Stafford, Teresa Lynne Stafford. (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

3 #1

Blank Forms

#3

(#3) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Jacob Tedder. (jlh) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to Crossclaim of USAA by Jacob Tedder.(O'Hearn, Beverly) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to Crossclaim of Progressive by Jacob Tedder.(O'Hearn, Beverly) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Litigants' Bill of Rights by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Ash, Ellen) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Ash, Ellen) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) USAA Casualty Insurance Company ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Jacob Tedder by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Ash, Ellen) Modified on 10/5/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Jacob Tedder. (O'Hearn, Beverly) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ***Entered in Error*** (O'Hearn, Beverly) Modified on 10/4/2018 (jlh). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Jacob Tedder. (O'Hearn, Beverly) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Jacob Tedder.(O'Hearn, Beverly) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. (Bitting, Neil) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. (Bitting, Neil) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: #1 Signature Page) (jlh). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint of Progressive, CROSSCLAIM against Jacob Tedder by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company.(Bitting, Neil) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Donald Stafford, Teresa Lynne Stafford. (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 09/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Blank Forms.) (jlh) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Jacob Tedder. (jlh) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2444161. (jlh) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Jacob Tedder, filed by Teresa Lynne Stafford and Donald Stafford. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.)(jlh) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less