This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2018 at 20:39:18 (UTC).

Laura E. Staben et al v. Plains All American Pipeline, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2016 Laura E Staben filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Plains All American Pipeline, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:16-CV-01521

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Staben

William T. Kelley

Laura E. Staben

Hedrick Properties, Inc.

Jean M. Uhrich

Roger Alan Staben

Pelican GB, LLC

Frances D. Uhrich

Frank P. Staben, Jr.

Defendants

Plains All American Pipeline, L.P

Plains All American Pipeline, L.P.

Plains Pipeline, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven N H Wood

Attorney at Bergquist Wood Mcintosh and Seto LLP

1470 Maria Lane Suite 300

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Mark L Venardi

Attorney at Venardi Zurada LLP

700 Ygnacio Valley Road Suite 300

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

Brad Dennis Brian

Attorney at Munger Tolles and Olson LLP

350 S. Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Henry Weissmann

Attorney at Munger Tolles and Olson LLP

350 S Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Melinda E LeMoine

350 South Grand Avenue 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Thomas P Clancy

Attorney at Munger Tolles and Olson LLP

350 South Grand Ave, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Colin A Devine

Attorney at Munger Tolles and Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 5000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jordan Xavier Navarrette

Attorney at Munger Tolles and Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Daniel Benjamin Levin

Attorney at Munger, Tolles and Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 4/9/2018 at 02:00 PM. (wm) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P., identifying Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., and Plains Pipeline, L.P.. (Devine, Colin) (Entered: 12/19/2017)

#28

(#28) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 12/19/2017)

#27

(#27) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P..(Devine, Colin) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

#26

(#26) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Colin A Devine counsel for Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P.. Adding Colin A. Devine as counsel of record for Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., and Plains Pipeline, L.P. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., and Plains Pipeline, L.P.. (Attorney Colin A Devine added to party Plains All American Pipeline, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Devine added to party Plains Pipeline, L.P.(pty:dft))(Devine, Colin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

#25

(#25) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #24 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants shall have until December 18, 2017, to file a pleading responsive to Plaintiffs complaint. (ab) (Entered: 11/06/2017)

24 #1

Proposed Order Further Extending Time to Respond to Complaint

#24

(#24) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 18, 2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Further Extending Time to Respond to Complaint)(Attorney Melinda E LeMoine added to party Plains Pipeline, L.P.(pty:dft))(LeMoine, Melinda) (Entered: 11/01/2017)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 6, 2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Navarrette, Jordan) (Entered: 08/24/2017)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 as to Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, L.P. and Plains Pipeline, L.P.. (lwag) (Entered: 08/24/2016)

#6

(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Hedrick Properties, Inc., William T. Kelley, Pelican GB, LLC, Laura E. Staben, Roger Alan Staben, Frank P. Staben, Jr., Frances D. Uhrich, Jean M. Uhrich. (Venardi, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet and Summons should have been filed under separate events, not as attachments to the complaint. No further action is necessary unless requested by the Court. (jtil) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (jtil) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#22) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 6, 2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Navarrette, Jordan) (Entered: 08/24/2017)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 4/9/2018 at 02:00 PM. (wm) (Entered: 12/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P., identifying Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., and Plains Pipeline, L.P.. (Devine, Colin) (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P..(Devine, Colin) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Colin A Devine counsel for Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P.. Adding Colin A. Devine as counsel of record for Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., and Plains Pipeline, L.P. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., and Plains Pipeline, L.P.. (Attorney Colin A Devine added to party Plains All American Pipeline, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Colin A Devine added to party Plains Pipeline, L.P.(pty:dft))(Devine, Colin) (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #24 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants shall have until December 18, 2017, to file a pleading responsive to Plaintiffs complaint. (ab) (Entered: 11/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 18, 2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Further Extending Time to Respond to Complaint)(Attorney Melinda E LeMoine added to party Plains Pipeline, L.P.(pty:dft))(LeMoine, Melinda) (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 63 DAYS AND VACATING BRIEFING SCHEDULE granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer #22 , by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: After full consideration by this Court of the Parties' Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint, and for good cause showing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants shall have until November 6, 2017, to file a pleading responsive to Plaintiffs' complaint; and 2. The briefing schedule previously entered in this action for Defendants' potential motion to dismiss shall be vacated. (bm) (Entered: 08/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 6, 2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Navarrette, Jordan) (Entered: 08/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY 75 DAYS AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE #20 #20 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants shall have until September 4, 2017, to file a pleading responsive to Plaintiffs' complaint; 2. In the event that Defendants file a motion to dismiss, Plaintiffs' oppositionwill be due on or before October 9, 2017; 3. In the event that Defendants file a motion to dismiss, Defendants' reply will be due on or before October 30, 2017; and 4. In the event that Defendants file a motion to dismiss, the hearing on that motion shall be set for November 20, 2017. (lom) (Entered: 06/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Frank P. Staben, Jr., Jean M. Uhrich, Roger Alan Staben, Frances D. Uhrich, Pelican GB, LLC, William T. Kelley, Laura E. Staben, Hedrick Properties, Inc., upon Defendant Plains All American Pipeline, L.P. served on 9/1/2016, answer due 9/22/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Plains All American Pipeline L.P. in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Venardi, Mark) (Entered: 09/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 09/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-04113 PSG(JEMx). Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:16-cv-01521 PSG(JEMx). Signed by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (adel) (Entered: 09/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 as to Defendants Plains All American Pipeline, L.P. and Plains Pipeline, L.P.. (lwag) (Entered: 08/24/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Hedrick Properties, Inc., William T. Kelley, Pelican GB, LLC, Laura E. Staben, Roger Alan Staben, Frank P. Staben, Jr., Frances D. Uhrich, Jean M. Uhrich. (Venardi, Mark) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet and Summons should have been filed under separate events, not as attachments to the complaint. No further action is necessary unless requested by the Court. (jtil) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (jtil) (Entered: 08/23/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18389672 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Frank P. Staben, Jr., Jean M. Uhrich, Roger Alan Staben, Frances D. Uhrich, Pelican GB, LLC, William T. Kelley, Laura E. Staben, Hedrick Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Attorney Mark L Venardi added to party Hedrick Properties, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Mark L Venardi added to party William T. Kelley(pty:pla), Attorney Mark L Venardi added to party Pelican GB, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Mark L Venardi added to party Laura E. Staben(pty:pla), Attorney Mark L Venardi added to party Roger Alan Staben(pty:pla), Attorney Mark L Venardi added to party Frank P. Staben, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Mark L Venardi added to party Frances D. Uhrich(pty:pla), Attorney Mark L Venardi added to party Jean M. Uhrich(pty:pla))(Venardi, Mark) (Entered: 08/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Plains Pipeline, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas P Clancy