This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2018 at 07:15:20 (UTC).

ST. MARY'S OF MICHIGAN v. AZAR

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 ST MARY'S OF MICHIGAN filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against AZAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Emmet G. Sullivan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01790

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emmet G. Sullivan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ST. MARY'S OF MICHIGAN

Defendant

ALEX M. AZAR, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nolan Kent Smith

Attorney at HALL RENDER KILLIAN HEALTH & LYMAN, P.C.

500 North Meridian Street, Suite 400

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1293

N. Kent Smith

Attorney at HALL RENDER KILLIAN HEALTH & LYMAN, P.C.

500 North Meridian Street, Suite 400

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1293

Defendant Attorney

Johnny Hillary Walker, III

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 08/25/2018)

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/9/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

8 #2

Exhibit USPS Tracking

8 #1

Exhibit Certified Receipt

7 #2

Exhibit USPS Tracking

7 #1

Exhibit Certified Receipt

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/09/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

6 #1

Exhibit Certified Receipt

6 #2

Exhibit USPS Tracking

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 8/8/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

5 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/01/18. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ST. MARY'S OF MICHIGAN (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Kent Smith on behalf of ST. MARY'S OF MICHIGAN (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Answer Or Otherwise Response due by 11/7/2018. (mac) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting #10 unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond. The defendant shall therefore answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by no later than November 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/24/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 08/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/9/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/09/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 8/8/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/01/18. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ST. MARY'S OF MICHIGAN (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Kent Smith on behalf of ST. MARY'S OF MICHIGAN (Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW DISMISSAL against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5612658) filed by ST. MARY'S OF MICHIGAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Alex M. Azar, II, #3 Summons to Jeff Sessions, #4 Summons to Jessie K. Liu)(Smith, Nolan) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.