This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2018 at 07:50:39 (UTC).

St. John v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 St John filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James H. Payne and Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00310

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James H. Payne

Referral Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nanci M. St. John

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marianna E. McKnight

2448 E 81St St, Ste 2038

Tulsa, OK 74137

Defendant Attorney

Cheryl R. Triplett

Attorney at US Attorney (OKED)

520 Denison Ave

Muskogee, OK 74401

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/18/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#1

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Magistrate Judge's Availability with ORDER thereon by District Judge James H. Payne: Denying consent (cjt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Magistrate Judge's Availability with ORDER thereon by District Judge James H. Payne: Denying consent (cjt, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE of Complaint re: Social Security Administration (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Nanci M. St. John (McKnight, Marianna) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration - U. S. Attorney (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration - Regional Counsel (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne, referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number 18-cv-310-JHP-KEW. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne: Granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis(acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Marianna E. McKnight on behalf of Nanci M. St. John (McKnight, Marianna) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Nanci M. St. John Responses due by 9/25/2018(McKnight, Marianna) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/18/2018)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Nanci M. St. John (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Nanci M. St. John (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.