This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:59:28 (UTC).

(SS) Grom v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 SS Grom filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sheila K. Oberto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01361

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheila K. Oberto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Grom

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kelsey Mackenzie Brown

Attorney at Mackenzie Legal, PLLC

1003 Whitman Street

Tacoma, WA 98406

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

6 #2

Consent Form

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

6 #1

Order re Consent

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 USM Instructions) (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

4 #1

USM Instructions

#1

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by David Grom pursuant to order of the court. (Brown, Kelsey) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Kelsey Mackenzie Brown* *Mackenzie Legal, PLLC* *1003 Whitman Street* *Tacoma, WA 98406*. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 USM Instructions) (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by David Grom. (Brown, Kelsey) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by David Grom (Brown, Kelsey) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by David Grom. Attorney Brown, Kelsey Mackenzie added.(Brown, Kelsey) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.