This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:03:08 (UTC).

Square v. United States Citizenship and Immigrations Services et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Square filed an Immigration - Naturalization lawsuit against United States Citizenship and Immigrations Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Philip R. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00246

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Naturalization

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip R. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ana Luisa Square

Defendants

L Francis Cissna

Mario Ortiz

Margaret Hartnett

United States Citizenship and Immigrations Services

Attorney General Jeff Sessions

Kirstjen Nielsen

John F. Bash

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marcela Gyires

Attorney at Pozo Goldstein, LLP

2000 South Dixie Hwy., Suite 101

Miami, FL 33133

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marcela Gyires for Ana Luisa Square. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ana Luisa Square. Jeff Sessions served on 9/24/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Gyires, Marcela) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ana Luisa Square. Margaret Hartnett served on 9/21/2018, answer due 11/20/2018. (Gyires, Marcela) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ana Luisa Square. John F. Bash served on 9/24/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Gyires, Marcela) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/5/2018) (dt). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Certified Mail Return Receipt of #3 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (dt) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to L Francis Cissna, Margaret Hartnett, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mario Ortiz, Jeff Sessions, John Bash. (dt) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ana Luisa Square. (Gyires, Marcela) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certified Mail Receipt of #3 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (mg2) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marcela Gyires for Ana Luisa Square. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Philip R. Martinez. (mg2) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ana Luisa Square. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mn) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint for Writ of Mandamus and Petition for a Hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Naturalization ( Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 300032168), filed by Ana Luisa Square. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mn) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Schydlower (mn) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less