This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2018 at 07:01:17 (UTC).

Sprint Communications, Inc. v. Kummetov et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2017 Sprint Communications, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Kummetov. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale and J. Thomas Marten. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-02714

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judge

J. Thomas Marten

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sprint Communications, Inc.

Defendants

Adik Kummetov

John Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael S. Foster

Polsinelli Pc - 48Th Street, 900 W. 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

Jay E. Heidrick

Polsinelli Pc - 48Th Street, 900 W. 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

Russell S. Jones, Jr.

Polsinelli Pc - 48Th Street, 900 W. 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/9/18. (aw) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Sprint Communications, Inc.(Foster, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Sprint Communications, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Foster, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

#4

(#4) AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by Sprint Communications, Inc.. Amendment to #2 Civil Cover Sheet . (Foster, Michael) (Modified on 12/20/2017 to correct title of document in docket text. (hl)) (Entered: 12/19/2017)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sprint Communications, Inc. identifying Sprint Corporation and SoftBank Group Corp. as corporate parent . (Foster, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Sprint Communications, Inc.. (Foster, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4357131.), filed by Sprint Communications, Inc..(Foster, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/9/18. (aw) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Sprint Communications, Inc.(Foster, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Sprint Communications, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Foster, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by Sprint Communications, Inc.. Amendment to #2 Civil Cover Sheet . (Foster, Michael) (Modified on 12/20/2017 to correct title of document in docket text. (hl)) (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sw) (Entered: 12/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sprint Communications, Inc. identifying Sprint Corporation and SoftBank Group Corp. as corporate parent . (Foster, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Sprint Communications, Inc.. (Foster, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4357131.), filed by Sprint Communications, Inc..(Foster, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sprint Communications Company, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Foster

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell S. Jones, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay E. Heidrick