This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2019 at 18:30:34 (UTC).

Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Grande Communications Network, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2018 Sprint Communications Company L P filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Grande Communications Network, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00363

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sprint Communications Company L.P.

Defendants

Radiate Holdings, L.P.

TPG Global, LLC

Grande Communications Network, LLC

WaveDivision Holdings, LLC

RCN Telecom Services, LLC

Special Master

Allen M. -SM- Terrell, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shanti Mulpuru Katona

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1101

Wilmington, DE 19801

Aaron E Hankel

B. Trent Webb

Robert H. Reckers

Ryan D. Dykal

Jordan T. Bergsten

Ryan J Schletzbaum

Mark D. Schafer

Christina Marie Belitz

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1101

Wilmington, DE 19801

Lauren E. Douville

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Colin Mayo

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, 8Th Floor, P.O. Box 1150

Wilmington, DE 19899

Amy E. Bergeron

Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie

Robinson Vu

 

Court Documents

110 #1

Exhibits A and B

#110

#109

#108

107 #2

Exhibit B

107 #1

Exhibit A

#107

106 #1

Certification of Michael W. Gray

#106

1 #16

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #15

Exhibit O

1 #14

Exhibit N

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit A

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third-Party Subpoenas on 1) InfoStructure Solutions Inc. on April 4, 2019 and 2) iGlass Properties, LLC on April 5, 2019 filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B)(Belitz, Christina) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sprint's Identification of Claim Terms for Potential Construction filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P..(Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' List of Claim Terms for Construction filed by Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC.(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) NOTICE of Third-Party Subpoenas to InfoStructure Solutions Inc. and iGLASS Properties, LLC by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Belitz, Christina) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (106 in 17-cv-1734-RGA, 111 in 18-cv-536-RGA, 70 in 17-cv-1736-RGA, 67 in 18-cv-361-RGA, 74 in 18-cv-363-RGA, 81 in 18-cv-362-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael W. Gray, filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/29/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael W. Gray - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael W. Gray)(Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ORDER Appointing Special Master: Allen M. Terrell, Jr., appointed (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/13/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ORDER REFERRING CASES to Clerk for assignment of a Special Master. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/7/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Shanti M. Katona, Esq. regarding Special Master Appointment. (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Docket(#70) ORAL ORDER: The request for leave to file early summary judgment (see CA 17-1734-RGA at D.I. 69 and D.I. 72) is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/28/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. RCN Telecom Services, LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Radiate Holdings, L.P. served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. TPG Global, LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The Summons returned executed at D.I. 5 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall refile the returned summons each at there own docket item entries, thereby allowing the service date to be included and an answering due date to be set. (nms) (Entered: 04/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00361-RGA, 1:18-cv-00362-RGA, 1:18-cv-00363-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 03/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Grande Communications Network, LLC on 3/8/2018; RCN Telecom Services, LLC on 3/8/2018; Radiate Holdings, L.P. on 3/8/2018; TPG Global, LLC on 3/8/2018; WaveDivision Holdings, LLC on 3/8/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb) (Entered: 03/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sprint Corporation, Corporate Parent Sprint Communications, Inc., Corporate Parent SoftBank Corp. for Sprint Communications Company L.P. filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (crb) (Entered: 03/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) See Attachment. (crb) (Entered: 03/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb) (Entered: 03/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Grande Communications Network, LLC, RCN Telecom Services, LLC, Radiate Holdings, L.P., TPG Global, LLC, WaveDivision Holdings, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2336596.) - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb) (Entered: 03/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Grande Communications Networks LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wavedivision Holdings, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where RCN Telecom Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sprint Communications Company, L.P. is a litigant