This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2019 at 17:04:07 (UTC).

Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2017 Sprint Communications Company L P filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Charter Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-01734

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Sprint Communications Company L.P.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Charter Communications Operating, LLC

Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC

Charter Communications, Inc.

Charter Communications Holdings, LLC

Bright House Networks, LLC

Special Master

Allen M. -SM- Terrell, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Shanti Mulpuru Katona

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1101

Wilmington, DE 19801

Robert H. Reckers

Aaron E Hankel

B. Trent Webb

Ryan D. Dykal

Ryan J Schletzbaum

Mark D. Schafer

Christina Marie Belitz

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1101

Wilmington, DE 19801

Lauren E. Douville

Jordan T. Bergsten

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Kelly E. Farnan

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael J. Block

Jeanne M. Heffernan

Alex Henriques

Robert J. Katerberg

David S. Benyacar

Thomas T. Carmack

Bao T. Nguyen

Luke L. Dauchot

Daniel L. Reisner

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#160

(#160) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Charter Defendants' Privilege Log filed by Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC.(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

168 #1

Exhibit A

168 #159

(#159) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third-Party Subpoena to Ribbon Communications Securities Corp. filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vavala, Christina) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#167

(#158) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Markman Brief filed by Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC.(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

166 #1

Exhibit 1

166 #157

(#157) NOTICE of Third-Party Subpoena To Ribbon Communications Securities Corp. by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vavala, Christina) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

165 #1

Exhibit 1

165 #156

(#156) NOTICE of Third-Party Subpoena To Nokia Networks, Inc. by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vavala, Christina) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

164 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #14

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Holdings, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2276040.) - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

242 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#160) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Charter Defendants' Privilege Log filed by Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC.(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#159) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third-Party Subpoena to Ribbon Communications Securities Corp. filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vavala, Christina) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • SO ORDERED, re (130 in 17-cv-1736-RGA, 151 in 17-cv-1734-RGA, 160 in 18-cv-536-RGA, 113 in 18-cv-361-RGA, 113 in 18-cv-363-RGA, 133 in 18-cv-362-RGA) STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time to file Joint Claim Construction Brief to September 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01734-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#158) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Markman Brief filed by Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC.(Farnan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#157) NOTICE of Third-Party Subpoena To Ribbon Communications Securities Corp. by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vavala, Christina) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#156) NOTICE of Third-Party Subpoena To Nokia Networks, Inc. by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vavala, Christina) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#155) NOTICE of Third-Party Subpoena To Net2Phone, Inc./IDT Corporation by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vavala, Christina) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#154) NOTICE of Third-Party Subpoena To Metaswitch Networks Corporation by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vavala, Christina) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#153) NOTICE of Third-Party Subpoena To Cisco Systems, Inc. by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vavala, Christina) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#152) NOTICE of Third-Party Subpoena To AudioCodes, Inc. by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vavala, Christina) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
198 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORAL ORDER: The Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance (D.I. #5 ) is DENIED without prejudice. All certifications need to be dated. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/6/2017. (nms) (Entered: 12/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert H. Reckers. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/6/2017. (nms) (Entered: 12/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert H. Reckers - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Katona, Shanti) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Trent Webb, Aaron E. Hankel, and Ryan D. Dykal - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Katona, Shanti) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2017: #1 Certifications) (crb). (Entered: 12/04/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Bright House Networks, LLC on 12/1/2017; Charter Communications Holdings, LLC on 12/1/2017; Charter Communications Operating, LLC on 12/1/2017; Charter Communications, Inc. on 12/1/2017; Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC on 12/1/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sprint Corporation, Corporate Parent SoftBank Corp. for Sprint Communications Company L.P. filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (nmg) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,343,084; 6,633,561; 6,463,052; 6,452,932; 6,473,429; 6,298,064; 6,330,224, 6,697,340, 7,286,561, 7,505,454, 7,327,728, 7,324,534, 7,693,131. (nmg) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Bright House Networks, LLC, Charter Communications Holdings, LLC, Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2276040.) - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.