This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/05/2018 at 07:09:31 (UTC).

Spirit Clothing Company v. College Concepts LLC

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 Spirit Clothing Company filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against College Concepts LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-07756

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spirit Clothing Company

Defendant

College Concepts LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Willmore F Holbrow, III

Attorney at Buchalter APC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company.(Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: This action has been assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls upon the attorneys in the action and upon the Court. All counsel, including pro se litigants, are hereby ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant College Concepts LLC. (car) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company, identifying Spirit Clothing Company and College Concepts LLC. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22377007 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Spirit Clothing Company(pty:pla))(Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company.(Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: This action has been assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls upon the attorneys in the action and upon the Court. All counsel, including pro se litigants, are hereby ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant College Concepts LLC. (car) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company, identifying Spirit Clothing Company and College Concepts LLC. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22377007 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Spirit Clothing Company(pty:pla))(Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spirit Clothing Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Willmore F Holbrow, III