This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/05/2018 at 07:10:36 (UTC).

Spirit Clothing Company v. Active Sports Wear, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 Spirit Clothing Company filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Active Sports Wear, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-07799

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Spirit Clothing Company

Defendant

Active Sports Wear, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Willmore F Holbrow, III

Attorney at Buchalter APC

1000 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorney

Adam I Gafni

Attorney at Gafni and Levin LLP

2811 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 780

Santa Monica, CA 90403

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Active Sports Wear, Inc. answer now due 11/21/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Active Sports Wear, Inc..(Attorney Adam I Gafni added to party Active Sports Wear, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gafni, Adam) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07799 AB(AGRx). (rn) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Active Sports Wear, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company, identifying Spirit Clothing Company and Active Sports Wear, Inc. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22381131 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Spirit Clothing Company(pty:pla))(Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Active Sports Wear, Inc. answer now due 11/21/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Active Sports Wear, Inc..(Attorney Adam I Gafni added to party Active Sports Wear, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gafni, Adam) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-07799 AB(AGRx). (rn) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Active Sports Wear, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (lh) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company, identifying Spirit Clothing Company and Active Sports Wear, Inc. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22381131 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Spirit Clothing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Willmore F Holbrow, III added to party Spirit Clothing Company(pty:pla))(Holbrow, Willmore) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spirit Clothing Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Willmore F Holbrow, III