This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2019 at 08:06:55 (UTC).

Spindle v. CKJ Trucking LP

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 Spindle filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CKJ Trucking LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly C Priest Johnson and Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00818

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kimberly C Priest Johnson

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David W. Spindle

Defendant

CKJ Trucking, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald R Huff

Attorney at Attorney at Law

112 S Crockett

Sherman, TX 75090

Defendant Attorneys

Shelby Mishel Broaddus

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons, LLP - Dallas

700 North Pearl Street, Suite 2500, Plaza Of The Americas

Dallas, TX 75201

John LeRoy Ross

Attorney at Thompson Coe

700 N Pearl St, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by CKJ Trucking, LP (Ross, John) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shelby Mishel Broaddus on behalf of CKJ Trucking, LP (Broaddus, Shelby) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: January 14, 2019. File joint report of attorney conference: January 28, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on Wednesday, February 20, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. before the United States Magistrate Judge in Courtroom 108, 7940 Preston Road, Plano, Texas 75024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 12/20/2018. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by CKJ Trucking, LP CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (Ross, John) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#4

(#4) DEFENDANTS ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (DOCKET NO. 1) by CKJ Trucking, LP.(Ross, John) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by David W. Spindle. CKJ Trucking, LP served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to CKJ Trucking, LP. (rpc, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7028491.), filed by David W Spindle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huff, Ronald) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by CKJ Trucking, LP (Ross, John) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shelby Mishel Broaddus on behalf of CKJ Trucking, LP (Broaddus, Shelby) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: January 14, 2019. File joint report of attorney conference: January 28, 2019. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference on Wednesday, February 20, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. before the United States Magistrate Judge in Courtroom 108, 7940 Preston Road, Plano, Texas 75024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 12/20/2018. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by CKJ Trucking, LP CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS (Ross, John) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEFENDANTS ANSWER to #1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (DOCKET NO. 1) by CKJ Trucking, LP.(Ross, John) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by David W. Spindle. CKJ Trucking, LP served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued as to CKJ Trucking, LP. (rpc, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (rpc, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7028491.), filed by David W Spindle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huff, Ronald) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John L Ross

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shelby Mishel Broaddus